New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Margo K Brodie
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:20-cv-05714
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 19, 2022 10:07 PM EST
Defendant
Kevin Hoffman
Defendant
Trivek Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Vector Remote Care, LLC
Plaintiff
United States of America
Relator
Vanessa Mathurin
Represented By
Benjamin Lin
Brown, LLC
contact info
Patrick Sidney Almonrode
Brown, LLC
contact info
Jason T. Brown
Brown, LLC
contact info
Chunsoo Terence Park
Brown, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Unseal Case Tue 01/18 11:45 AM
Order to Unseal Case. It is ordered that the complaint be unsealed. All other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal, except for this Order and the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; and that the seal be lifted as to all matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/18/2022. (Piper, Francine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Hoffman, Trivek Health Solutions, Inc., Vector Remote Care, LLC Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vanessa Mathurin. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/9/2021) (Gillespie, Saudia).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Sealing Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (6/8/2021) Exhibit A,
Att: 4 (6/8/2021) Exhibit B,
Att: 5 (6/8/2021) Exhibit C