Original Case: 5:21-cv-01068

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-00083
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2022
Terminated:Aug 01, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
NY State Fund Ins.
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bonita Hill
Represented By
Bonita Hill
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/02/2022 4:28 AM EDT
Friday, January 14, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bonita Hill, FILED. [3244522] [22-83] [Entered: 01/18/2022 09:56 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED
2 2 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION & ORDER, dated 12/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3244550] [22-83] [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:05 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3244557] [22-83] [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:07 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3244558] [22-83] [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:08 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 4 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED