New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:22-cv-00484
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2022
Terminated:Oct 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 18, 2022 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Den Construction, LLC
Plaintiff
Den Outdoors, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Richard Ranallo
Nicholas Ranallo, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 28, 2022
18 18 2 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted Fri 10/28 12:08 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 10/27/2022 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/27 7:55 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Den Construction, LLC. Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/01 11:26 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause in writing on or before October 3, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution under Rule 41(b). Failure to respond to this Order will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice for want of prosecution. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/1/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
15 15 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 05/16 11:44 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Den Construction, LLC.(km)
Related: [-]
14 14 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 05/16 10:58 AM
DECLARATION of Nicholas Ranallo in Support re:12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Mon 05/16 10:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Ranallo to RE-FILE Document 13 Affidavit. Use the event type Other Answers, Declaration in support of a non-motion. (km)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 15, 2022
13 13 respoth Affidavit (non-motion) Sun 05/15 11:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas Ranallo re:12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default
12 12 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Sun 05/15 11:16 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Sun 05/15 4:20 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas Ranallo re:10 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, . Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Fri 05/13 11:14 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion9 Motion for Entry of Default. The motion is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Insofar as Plaintiff seeks a Certificate of Default, it is referred to the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. To the extent Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, it is referred to this Court's Individual Practices. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of service on the docket by 5:00 p.m. on May 16, 2022. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/13/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
9 9 motion Entry of Default Thu 05/12 11:54 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to DEN CONSTRUCTION, LLC . Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Cert of Default
Thursday, April 14, 2022
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 04/14 1:11 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Den Construction, LLC served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Den Outdoors, Inc...(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
7 7 misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Thu 01/20 2:43 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 01/20 1:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Den Construction, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 01/20 1:48 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/20 1:49 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/20 1:49 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 01/20 1:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas Richard Ranallo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DEN OUTDOORS INC, DEN CONSTRUCTION LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/19 1:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DEN OUTDOORS INC..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Wed 01/19 1:01 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/19 1:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Den Construction LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by DEN OUTDOORS INC..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/19 1:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/19 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against DEN CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25604959)Document filed by DEN OUTDOORS INC..(Ranallo, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A