Alaska District Court
Judge:Joshua M Kindred
Case #: 4:22-cv-00002
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2022
Terminated:May 24, 2023
Case in other court:Alaska State Court, 4FA-21-02510CI
Last checked: Monday Jul 18, 2022 12:50 AM AKDT
Defendant
Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.
Represented By
Laura L. Farley
Farley & Graves, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Penney
Represented By
William A. Earnhart
Birch Horton Bittner & Cherot
contact info

GPO May 24 2023
ORDER granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 5/23/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM AKDT
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/24 10:42 AM
ORDER granting18 Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 5/23/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/22 2:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dale Penney. (Earnhart, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/15 2:56 PM
ORDER granting16 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 2/15/23. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/13 12:26 PM
NOTICE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. re12 Scheduling Order (Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Wed 02/01 11:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Burke, at docket14 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
14 14 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Tue 12/13 8:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Paul Burke. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3355897.) by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc..(Graves, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/09 1:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.. (Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/01 9:59 AM
SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 6/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2023. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 8/1/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
11 11 misc Status Report Thu 07/28 10:23 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Dale Penney. (Earnhart, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/26 8:46 AM
ORDER re9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Joint Status Report due within seven days. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/27/22. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 07/15 1:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Earnhart, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/07 10:03 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc..(Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
order Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) Tue 06/28 10:55 AM
CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: An answer has not been filed by, nor default taken as to defendant Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. that was served in this case. Plaintiff will respond to this notice of deficiency on or before 7/12/22 by filing a motion for entry of default or explaining why a motion for entry of default has not been filed. Failure to respond to this deficiency notice may result in the dismissal of the complaint for lack of prosecution as to that defendant. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s) Wed 02/02 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.(Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal Wed 01/19 12:50 PM
ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Service List Wed 01/19 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. (Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/19 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L. Farley on behalf of Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. (Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/19 12:20 PM
Civil Cover Sheet. (Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/19 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. from State Court Fairbanks, case number 4FA-21-02510CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3192266), filed by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc..(Farley, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint