South Dakota District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-50179
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jan 20, 2022 1:38 AM CST
Defendant
Scott Johnson (1)
Represented By
Jonathan P. McCoy
Costello Porter Hill Heisterkamp Bushnell & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gina S. Nelson
U.S. Attorney'S Office (rapid City, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/20/2022 1:49 AM CST
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
1 1 INDICTMENT (personal identifiers redacted) as to Scott Johnson (1) count(s) 1. NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Scott Johnson. (SLT)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Scott Johnson (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 12/21/2021. (SLT)
Related: [-]