Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:21-cr-00273
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jan 21, 2022 1:21 AM CST
Defendant
Mehran Makari Saheli (1)
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Shannon R. Elkins
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah E. Hudleston
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/14/2022 8:29 AM CDT
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
1 1 2 pgs INDICTMENT (unsealed 01/05/2022) assigned to Judge David S. Doty referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz by USA Sarah E. Hudleston as to Mehran Makari Saheli (1) count 1. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (MKB) Qc'd on 12/28/2021 (KNK). Modified text on 1/6/2022 (LEG).
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Mehran Makari Saheli. (MKB) Qc'd on 12/28/2021 (KNK).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Signature Page
3 3 2 pgs Bench Warrant Issued as to Mehran Makari Saheli by Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (MKB)
Related: [-]
4 4 Oral Motion to Seal pursuant to LR 49.1 the Indictment be sealed and remain sealed until the defendant has had his first appearance by USA as to Mehran Makari Saheli. (MKB)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral Order granting Motion to Seal pursuant to Rule 49.1(d) of the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota, the indictments proposed to be filed under seal be so filed and remain sealed until the defendant make his/her initial appearance before the court as to Mehran Makari Saheli (1) by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/22/21. (MKB)
Related: [-]