Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:22-mc-00012
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
3 3 misc Public Correspondence Received Tue 04/05 4:53 PM
Non-public correspondence received from 5th Circuit Court of Appeals re: Ray Jackson. Attorney disbarred on 3/8/2022. Related [+] Modified on 4/5/2022
Related: [-] kckc
Monday, February 14, 2022
2 2 order Attorney Disciplinary Order Mon 02/14 10:00 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER Re: Attorney Disciplinary Action as to Rayshun Jackson. The deadline for filing a response has passed. The clerk has imposed reciprocal discipline and attorney Rayshun Jackson has been removed from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice in the US District Court, Northern District of Texas. See Order1 for more details. If the attorney has an active ECF account, it will be terminated as of this date. Cases Report for Internal Users accessible[LINK:here] . (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/14/2022) Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Monday, January 24, 2022
1 1 order Attorney Disciplinary Order Mon 01/24 11:24 AM
Order Re: Attorney Disciplinary Action as to Rayshun Jackson. Standing Order to show cause why this court should not impose reciprocal discipline. (Attorney Rayshun Jackson resigned in lieu of discipline from the Supreme Court of Texas on 11/09/21.) Cases Report for Internal Users accessible[LINK:here] . Attorney Response due in 14 days. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/24/2022) (ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of the Supreme Court of Texas