Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:22-cv-00278
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2022
Terminated:Feb 02, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 23, 2022 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Jason Slaughter
Defendant
Team Roofing & Construction, L.L.C.
Plaintiff
Dionne Panchoo
Represented By
Victor Severin Roberts
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 02/02 8:07 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING4 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/02 8:09 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/01 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Dionne Panchoo. (Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 01/24 4:10 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Jason Slaughter. (lwb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 01/24 4:10 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Team Roofing & Construction, L.L.C. (lwb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/24 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11537352) filed by Dionne Panchoo.(lwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/24 4:13 PM
Submission of1 Complaint under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (lwb)
Related: [-]