Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-22744

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:22-ap-01017
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2022
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
F1 General Trading Partners, L.P.
Represented By
F1 General Trading Partners, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
F3 Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By
F3 Real Estate Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
F7 Group Operating Partners, LLC
Represented By
F7 Group Operating Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
FF Fund Management, LLC
Represented By
FF Fund Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
FF Trading Management, LLC
Represented By
FF Trading Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
FF Reserve Account, LLC
Represented By
FF Reserve Account, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Andrew T. Franzone, LLC
Represented By
Andrew T. Franzone, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet R Kapila
100 SE 2 St #4400
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2022
"Opinion" Order Granting In Part Defendant's (Re: 22 Motion To Stay filed by Defendant F1 General Trading Partners, L.P., Defendant FF Fund Management, LLC, Defendant FF Trading Management, LLC, Defendant FF Reserve Account, LLC, Defendant Andrew T. Franzone, LLC). (Rodriguez, Olga)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
145 145 court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/12 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1017 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]