Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:22-cv-00206
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2022
Terminated:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 24, 2022 3:02 AM MDT
Defendant
Mark Precious
Defendant
CarbonHelix
Plaintiff
Jenne Marie Esch
[Pro Se E-Filer, effective 2/3/2022] 19960 Chisholm Trail
Monument, CO 80132
Plaintiff
Andrew Morton Garrett
Plaintiff
Robert Hubbard
19960 Chisholm Trail
Monument, CO 80132
Plaintiff
Eric Esch
19960 Chisholm Trail
Monument, CO 80132
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of David Hannum
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Red Point Financial Group
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Banrupt Estate of David Stevens
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Steven Sherman
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Ryan Robertson
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Rick Bailey
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Mark Precious
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Jersey Green
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of Jared Polis
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Defendant
Bankrupt Estate of James Miller
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Plaintiff
Carbon Helix, LLC
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Plaintiff
Raw & Co
Terminated: 02/03/2022
19960 Chisholm Trail
Monument, CO 80132


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, February 09, 2023
58 58 misc Mail Returned Fri 02/10 4:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 57 Order, Addressed to Robert Hubbard. (athom, )
Related: [-]