Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:22-mj-00059
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2022
Terminated:Jan 24, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 1:23 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
J Stevenson Weimer-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jason Benjamin Blythe (1)
Terminated: 01/24/2022
Represented By
John J Stickney-FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/26/2022 1:42 AM CST
Monday, January 24, 2022
Arrest (Rule 5) of Jason Benjamin Blythe. Case Number 1:21-cr-00537 indictment and warrant from the District of Columbia. (jah)
Related: [-]
1 1 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance Rule 5(C) as to Jason Benjamin Blythe held on 1/24/2022. Date of Arrest: 1/24/2022 On warrant from the District of Columbia; Deft executed financial affidavit; o/appointing FPD entered; Gov't not moving for detention; Deft executed PR bond & advised of conditions of pretrial release; o/setting conditions of pretrial release entered; Deft released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Jay Weimer; Defense - John Stickney. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Teel.) (jah)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jason Benjamin Blythe. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/24/2022) (jah)
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Jason Benjamin Blythe: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/24/2022) (jah)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5(c) Hearings by Jason Benjamin Blythe (jah)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jason Benjamin Blythe (1) Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. [reporting instructions were attached to deft's copy of this order as to his next appearance in the District of Columbia] (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/24/2022) (jah)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice FROM Texas Northern TO District of Columbia of a Rule 5, Rule 32.1, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Jason Benjamin Blythe. Your case number is: 1:21-cr-00537. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to the national list host at InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (jah)
Related: [-]