Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00878
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 25, 2022 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GARY WATERS
Represented By
NICHOLAS SCOTT CLEVENGER
Peterson & Associates Pc - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 6:03 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/26 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6644983.), filed by GARY WATERS. (CLEVENGER, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet