Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00907
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ALEXANDER BEAM
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 28, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/28 1:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 01/27 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by ALEXANDER BEAM (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/27 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6646419.), filed by ALEXANDER BEAM. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet