Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:R Barclay Surrick
Case #: 2:22-cv-00344
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, 21-24650
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
COMMAND ALKON INCORPORATED
1800 International Park Drive Suite 400
Birmingham, AL 35243
Represented By
JOSH C. HARRISON
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT C. PERRYMAN
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
JOSHUA BRAND
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
NANCY E. THOMPSON
Represented By
WILLIAM T. WILSON
Law Office Of William T. Wilson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
LIBRA SYSTEMS, INC.
Terminated: 04/13/2022
220 Stahl Road
Harleysville, PA 19438
Represented By
JOSHUA BRAND
Ogletree Deakins
contact info

GPO May 22 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/22/23. 5/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
GPO May 22 2023
ORDER THAT COMMAND ALKON'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION 51 IS GRANTED IN PART AS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. THE PARTIES SHALL PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A JOINT STATUS UPDATE CONCERNING THE CASE, INCLUDING INFORMATION AS TO HOW PARTIES INTEND TO PROCEED WITH THE LITIGATION, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE ISSUANCE OF THIS ORDER; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/22/23. 5/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
112 112 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 05/21 1:16 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/21/24. 5/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]