CHAPPLE v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00930 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN CHAPPLE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER - The Court finds no adequate grounds for reconsideration and plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/28/2022. (djb) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 05/09 10:46 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:5 MOTION for Reconsideration re4 Order Dismissing Case (djb) |
||
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Reconsideration re4 Order Dismissing Case, by BRIAN CHAPPLE. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl) |
|
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by BRIAN CHAPPLE (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6647254.), filed by BRIAN CHAPPLE. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |