Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:22-cv-00360
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
CINDY BASS
Represented By
DAVID SMITH
Schnader Harrison Segal And Lewis L.L.P.
contact info
LAYAL A. ISSA
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By
BENJAMIN H. FIELD
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Ryan B. Smith
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
CARLA CAIN
Represented By
JOHN S. CARNES, JR.
Law Offices Of John S. Carnes Jr.
contact info
Sarah E Straub
Mette, Evans & Woodside
contact info
AARON D. MARTIN
Mette Evans & Woodside
contact info

GPO Dec 05 2022
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/5/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
GPO Dec 05 2022
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/5/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)

Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
51 51 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 02/28 3:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS OR ATTORNEYS' FEES. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/28/23. 2/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
50 50 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/28 11:02 AM
NOTICE by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA OF SETTLEMENT AMONG ALL PARTIES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) with Cert. of Service (Smith, Ryan)
Related: [-]