Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Teresa J James
Case #: 6:22-cv-01021
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 04, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By
Charles E. Millsap
Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch, Llc - Wichita
contact info
Lyndon W. Vix
Fleeson, Gooing, Coulson & Kitch, Llc - Wichita
contact info
Plaintiff
Kansas County Association Multiline Pool
Represented By
Heather Hatley
Franke Schultz & Mullen, PC
contact info
Heather R. Hatley
Franke Schultz & Mullen, PC
contact info
Christopher M. Harper
Franke Schultz & Mullen, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 04, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/04 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kansas County Association Multiline Pool Without Prejudice (Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/05 8:40 AM
Civil Case Terminated per 7 Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (mam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/14 9:32 AM
ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the Court grants Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Company until April 8, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/14/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/08 5:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Company Related [+] (Vix, Lyndon)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
4 4 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 02/22 3:39 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/09/2022 for Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/22/2022. (jk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 02/22 2:10 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Charles E. Millsap on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Company (Millsap, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 02/22 2:00 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lyndon W. Vix on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Company (Vix, Lyndon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 01/28 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 01/27 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5697812.), filed by Kansas County Association Multiline Pool.(Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Redacted B,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Redacted C,
Att: 4 ECF Registration Form Civil Cover Sheet