Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00018
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jan 28, 2022 1:19 AM CST
Defendant
Jevn Todd Griffitt (2)
Defendant
Paris Alison Ready (3)
Defendant
Christopher Richard Ward (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William A. Alford, III
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/28/2022 2:15 AM CST
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Christopher Richard Ward (1) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6, Jevn Todd Griffitt (2) count(s) 1, 7, 8, Paris Alison Ready (3) count(s) 1-3. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris as to Christopher Richard Ward, Jevn Todd Griffitt, Paris Alison Ready..Signed on 1/25/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark.(Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]