California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: D Thomas Ferraro
Case #: 3:22-cv-00112
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente CSC
Defendant
Lacey Lee
Defendant
Diane Niethamer
Defendant
OPEIU Local 30
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Wohlner
Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford Rosenfeld & Levy
contact info
Harrison A. Levy
Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford Rosenfeld & Levy
contact info
Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford & Rosenfeld
contact info
Plaintiff
Naa-anorkor Okai
307 S. 31st Street
San Diego, CA 92113
Plaintiff
James Kevin Tillory

GPO Aug 25 2022
ould she wish to proceed in this action, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff Okai SHALL FILE (1) proof of service of the Summons and the Complaint on each Defendant; and/or (2) a declaration under penalty of perjury showingORDER (1) Dismissing Plaintiff Tillory From Action, (2) Denying Leave To Amend Complaint, And (3) Ordering Plaintiff To Show Cause Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Timely To Effect Service On Defendants (ECF Nos. 13, 22). Sh good cause for her failure timely to serve any unserved Defendants, accompanied by a brief motion for leave to serve process outside of the ninety-day service limit. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 8/25/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth)
GPO Feb 21 2023
ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5); (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); (3) Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 25). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 02/21/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
95 95 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Fri 08/16 2:00 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to93 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Naa-anorkor Okai. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 9/9/2024 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 10/9/2024.) (cc: Court Reporter). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
94 94 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 08/16 1:58 PM
USCA Case Number: 24-5035 Re: ECF No.93 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Naa-anorkor Okai.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Appellate Mentoring Program
Friday, August 09, 2024
93 93 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Fri 08/09 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to91 Order on Motion to Dismiss,92 Clerk's Judgment by Naa-anorkor Okai., IFP Filed (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form 4. Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Prcoeed in Forma Pauperis,
Att: 2 Form 6 Representation Statement,
Att: 3 Form 27 Motion for Assignment of COunsel,
Att: 4 Designation of Record