Maryland District Court
Judge:Matthew J Maddox
Case #: 1:22-cv-00218
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Property Damage
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2022
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 27, 2022 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
The Fifth Fuel of Virginia, LLC
Represented By
Jeanie Scherrer Ismay
The Law Offices Of Frank F. Daily, P.A.
contact info
Sarah A Zadrozny
The Law Offices Of Frank F. Dailey, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Eric N Stravitz
Stravitz Law Firm, PC
contact info
Matthew Francis Noone
Cozen O Connor
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Southland Insulators, Inc.
Terminated: 06/14/2022
Represented By
Jeanie Scherrer Ismay
The Law Offices Of Frank F. Daily, P.A.
contact info

GPO Sep 16 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying 54 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Wenbrooke Electric LLC, Denying 55 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Aaron Redsicker, filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 9/16/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
72 72 order Settlement Order Mon 03/03 1:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/3/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/27 3:08 PM
Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to case. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
71 71 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 02/25 9:41 AM
Correspondence re: Line Regarding Settlement of All Claims (Dowgiewicz, Kevin)
Related: [-]