New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:22-cv-00508
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 24, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Artashes Baghdasaryn
Represented By
Keith J. Roberts
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Shannon Carroll
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-10
Defendant
Orthocare Supplies, Inc.
Represented By
Keith J. Roberts
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Shannon Carroll
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Philip P. Nash
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Philip P. Nash
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Philip P. Nash
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Philip P. Nash
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 13, 2023
order Order(Other) Thu 04/13 11:40 AM
ORDER re30 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. The stipulation is so ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/13/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/12 12:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants Orthocare Supplies, Inc. and Artashes Baghdasaryn by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Vanunu, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/24 8:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 60 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/24/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
29 29 1 pgs misc Status Report Thu 02/23 2:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Letter to Judge Azrack and Magistrate Judge Dunst re: Parties reached a settlement in principle by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 02/08 1:22 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice26 Motion to Compel; granting28 Motion to Adjourn Conference. According to DE28 , the parties are requesting adjournment of the 2/10/2023 Settlement Conference with the undersigned in light of the parties' representation that they intend to engage in "an earnest attempt to resolve this action without the need for the Courts involvement" and that "[b]oth sides are hopeful that the meet and confer process will be productive." The Court GRANTS the joint request to adjourn the 2/10/2023 Settlement Conference sine die and ORDERS the parties to provide the Court with an update on the status of their settlement discussions by 2/24/2023. Furthermore, in light of the parties' joint representation in DE28 regarding their ongoing settlement discussions, the Court is exercising its discretion to DENY WITHOUT PREJUDICE the pending motion concerning two non-party subpoenas at DE26 . See, e.g., Dietz v. Bouldin , 579 U.S. 40, 41 (2016) (discussion of the court's "inherent powers" that are "governed not by rule or statute but by the control necessarily vested in courts to manage their own affairs so as to achieve the orderly and expeditious disposition of cases"); Wood v. F.B.I. , 432 F.3d 78, 34 (2d Cir. 2005) (the courts have "broad discretion to manage pre-trial discovery"). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 2/8/2023. (CT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
28 28 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 02/07 3:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference and an update on settlement discussions by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
order Order(Other) Mon 02/06 11:12 AM
ORDER: At the parties' joint request on 11/22/2022 (DE 25), the Court agreed to conduct a settlement conference which is now set for 2/10/23. Per the Court's 1/18/23 Order, the parties were required to "confirm that they are prepared to participate in a productive settlement conference. According their joint 1/23/23 letter, the parties represented to the Court that they are prepared to participate in a productive settlement conference." DE 27. The Court has received the parties' ex parte submissions in advance of the 2/10/23 settlement conference, and it appears to the Court that the parties are not ready to engage in productive settlement discussions. The Court therefore ORDERS that the parties shall communicate by telephone (and not by email) as soon as possible to determine whether they intend to participate in a productive settlement conference (and, if so, then they shall exchange an updated offer and demand by 2/7/2023, and communicate that information to the Court in supplemental ex parte submissions by 2/8/23 at 4:30pm), or (2) advise the Court by 2/8/23 at 4:30pm that they request cancellation of the 2/10/23 settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 2/6/2023. (CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
27 27 misc Status Report Mon 01/23 2:58 PM
STATUS REPORT joint letter in accordance with the Courts January 18, 2023 Docket Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
26 26 motion Compel Fri 01/20 3:16 PM
Joint MOTION to Compel Joint letter motion seeking to compel responses to subpoenas on third-parties LGCV, Inc. and Enigma Commerce Corporation by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Copy of the Subpoena and affidavit of service for LGCV, Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Copy of the Subpoena and affidavit of service for Enigma Commerce Corporation
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
order Order(Other) Wed 01/18 2:05 PM
ORDER: By 1/26/2023, the parties shall update the Court on the status of the case and confirm that they are prepared to participate in a productive settlement conference on 2/10/2023. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 1/18/2023. (CT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
order Scheduling Order Wed 11/23 11:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re25 Letter: The Court will hold a Settlement Conference on 2/10/2023 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip. All counsel and clients with full authority to settle shall appear in person for the conference. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website. At least 7 business days prior to the settlement conference, the parties shall submit to chambers by email (dunst_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov) ex parte settlement letters outlining the information required in Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule V.C. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/23/2022. (CT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
25 25 misc Letter Tue 11/22 4:47 PM
Letter Joint letter in accordance with the Courts November 21, 2022 Docket Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
order Scheduling Order Mon 11/21 2:36 PM
ORDER: DE24 is GRANTED in part. All fact depositions shall be completed by 2/10/2023; the identification of case in chief experts and service of Rule 26 disclosures shall take place by 3/27/2023; the identification of rebuttal experts and service of Rule 26 disclosures shall take place by 4/28/2023; discovery shall close by 6/9/2023. Additionally, the proposed dates for a settlement conference do not work for the Court; the parties shall jointly inform the Court if they are available at the following times: 2/10/2023 at 2:00PM, 2/13/2023 at 2:00PM, or 2/17/2023 at 2:00PM. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/21/2022. (CT)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 11/18 2:39 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint letter in accordance with the Courts November 10, 2022 Docket Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
23 23 minutes Status Conference Thu 11/10 11:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/10/2022 before Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Philip P. Nash. Counsel for Defendant: Shannon Carroll. FTR #: 10:18-10:30, via Zoom. Case called. Counsel for all sides present. The Court and the parties discussed the status of the case and discovery. The parties shall advise the Court in a joint letter by 11/18/2022 how they would like to proceed with potentially scheduling a settlement conference, potentially amending the discovery schedule, and the parties' positions on Plaintiff's pending motion at DE21 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/10/2022. (CT)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
22 22 motion Stay Fri 10/21 6:59 PM
Notice of MOTION to Stay re21 Fully Briefed MOTION to Stay the Prosecution of Pending Collections Actions and Enjoin Future Collections Actions by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Vanunu, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stay Fri 10/21 6:30 PM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Stay the Prosecution of Pending Collections Actions and Enjoin Future Collections Actions by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Vanunu, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Vanunu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Kathleen Asmus,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Jonas Sokolof, M.D.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-Decision from Judge Pamela Chen in Govt Emps. Ins. Co. v. Big Apple Med Equipment, Inc., et al., 1:20-cv-05786-PKC-SJC, D.E. 52 (E.D.N.Y. March 25, 2021),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-Decision from Judge Pamela Chen in Govt Emps. Ins. Co. v. Wallegood, Inc., 1:21-cv-01986 PKC-RLM, D.E. 36 (E.D.N.Y. July 16, 2021),
Att: 6 Exhibit 5-Orthocares Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, dated June 7, 2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6-A representative sample of checks issued by Orthocare to Copiague Chiropractic,
Att: 8 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Stay and Enjoin,
Att: 9 Proposed Order,
Att: 10 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants Brief in Opposition to Motion to Stay and Enjoin No-Fault Collection Arbitrations, dated October 14, 2022,
Att: 11 Declaration of Shannon Carroll,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-copy of Orthocares supplemental answers to interrogatories,
Att: 13 Exhibit B-copies of the Leases between Copiague Chiropractic, PC and Orthocare Supplies, Inc., dated May 1, 2019 and August 12, 2020.,
Att: 14 Declaration Declaration of Artashes Baghdasaryan,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-to declaration of Artashes Baghdasaryan,
Att: 16 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Stay and Enjoin, dated October 21, 2022.
Thursday, October 06, 2022
20 20 motion Compel Thu 10/06 9:49 AM
Letter MOTION to Compel Motion seeking an Order compelling non-parties Copiague Chiropractic, P.C., LGCV, Inc., Empire Consulting Group NY, Inc., and Enigma Commerce Corp. to comply with the properly-served subpoenas dated July 22, 2022 by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copiague Chiropractic PC Subpoena,
Att: 2 LGCV Inc Subpoena,
Att: 3 Empire Consulting Group NY Inc Subpoena,
Att: 4 Enigma Commerce Corporation Subpoena
order Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/06 12:05 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion to Compel. DE20 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the Individual Rules of Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst; specifically, the parties failed to meet and confer before raising the motion to the Court and did not properly raise the discovery issue in a joint letter. Further, the Status Conference previously scheduled for 10/25/2022 is ADJOURNED to 11/10/2022 at 10:15AM and will proceed via Zoom. The Court will email a Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 10/6/2022. (CT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
order Order(Other) Tue 09/20 12:42 PM
ORDER re19 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. The briefing schedule is So Ordered and set forth as follows: Plaintiffs motion shall be served by September 30, 2022; Defendants opposition shall be served by October 14, 2022; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be served by October 21, 2022. The moving party is responsible for filing the fully briefed motion on ECF. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/20/2022. (Posillico, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
19 19 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 09/19 3:41 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Briefing Schedule by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 09/15 11:43 AM
ORDER denying16 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 19, 2022. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/15/2022. (Terranova, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/03 4:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Plaintiffs respectfully request that a pre-motion conference be conducted at the Courts earliest convenience filed by Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc.. (Carroll, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 07/28 11:09 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Protective Order. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 7/28/2022. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
16 16 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 07/27 4:08 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Plaintiffs respectfully request that a pre-motion conference be conducted at the Courts earliest convenience by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Vanunu, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Protective Order Wed 07/27 2:56 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Request to So Order Confidentiality Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Protective Order
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/08 4:15 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/21 4:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Please See Order For Further Deadline and Hearing Details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/20/2022. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Thu 04/21 4:00 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Philip P. Nash. Counsel For Defendant: Shannon Carroll. Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/20/2022 at 2:30 PM. Following discussion with counsel and review of the submitted worksheet, the Court adopted a Scheduling Order which is attached at DE#14 . A Status conference has been scheduled for October 25, 222, at 11:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. A Pretrial conference has been scheduled for April 24, 2023, at 9:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. If the trial judge requires one, a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with that judge's requirements and signed by counsel for each party must be received by the undersigned 5 business days prior to this conference. (FTR Log #2:39-2:45 (video).) (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/11 12:25 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Nash, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/15 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Carroll on behalf of Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carroll, Shannon)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/15 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Roberts, Keith)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 03/15 9:19 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Matthew J. Conroy terminated from docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 3/15/2022. (Sanders, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
9 9 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 03/14 6:12 PM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc.. (Roberts, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/22 3:53 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference via Zoom will be held at 2:30 pm on 4/20/2022 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 4/13/2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 2/22/2022. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 JMW Individual Rules
Thursday, February 17, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/17 12:19 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc.. (Conroy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/11 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Orthocare Supplies, Inc. served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Sirignano, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/28 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Artashes Baghdasaryn, Orthocare Supplies, Inc. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/28 10:55 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/28 9:25 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Jakubowski, Laura).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/28/2022) Additional Corrections
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/28 10:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Artashes Baghdasaryn, John Doe Defendants 1-10, Orthocare Supplies, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15236506 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Levy, Barry) Modified on 1/28/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons and Rider,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date