Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01038
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 30, 2022 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BELINDA JIMENEZ LOPEZ
Represented By
LESLEY CATHERINE PANISZCZYN
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 17, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/17 3:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PANISZCZYN, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Tue 02/08 1:46 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/31 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6651238.), filed by BELINDA JIMENEZ LOPEZ. (PANISZCZYN, LESLEY)
Related: [-]