Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:22-cv-00173
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2022
Re-opened:Aug 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 27, 2022 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
APOSTOLATE FOR FAMILY CONSECRATION, INC.
Represented By
Daniel P. Taylor
Taylor & Makricostas
contact info
Mediator
GARY P. CARUSO
Represented By
Gary P. Caruso
Noblemediations
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH E. HUDAK
Represented By
Joseph E. Hudak
Law Office Of Joseph E. Hudak
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
87 87 order Judgment (Rule 58) Wed 07/26 10:43 AM
JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58 entered in favor of Defendant Apostolate for Family Consecration, Inc. and against Plaintiff Joseph E. Hudak. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/26/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
86 86 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 07/26 10:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING64 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING77 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/26/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
85 85 19 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 07/26 10:40 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re64 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by APOSTOLATE FOR FAMILY CONSECRATION, INC. and77 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JOSEPH E. HUDAK. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/26/23. (eca)
Related: [-]