Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01116
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2022
Terminated:Mar 30, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2022 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PERRY HOLMES
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
3 3 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/30 10:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by PERRY HOLMES. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 02/01 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by PERRY HOLMES (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/01 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6654754.), filed by PERRY HOLMES. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet