Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01094
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-02136
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HARRIS
Represented By
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
ALBERT HICKS
Terminated: 02/01/2022
Represented By
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
BILLEIGH RISER
Terminated: 02/01/2022
Represented By
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
DALE ROUFS
Terminated: 02/01/2022
Represented By
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 02/08 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by MICHAEL HARRIS (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/08 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M PAUL, III on behalf of MICHAEL HARRIS (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/08 1:43 PM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MICHAEL HARRIS. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
10 10 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/01 3:33 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. For short form complaints filed within 30 days of the date of the dismissal without prejudice pursuant to this Order, the filing date for the short form complaint will relate back to the filing date of the original multi- plaintiff complaint from which the individual plaintiff was severed. DALE ROUFS, ALBERT HICKS and BILLEIGH RISER terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (First named Plaintiff, HARRIS' Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 3/3/2022 .) (Severed Plaintiffs file Short Form Complaint by opening individual civil case no later than 3/3/2022 ) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 02/01 1:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-02136. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/01 10:58 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(CLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
7 7 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez to District Judge, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2136 JRT/TNL . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and deadlines in these cases may be reset (if necessary) by the new MJ Courtroom Deputy. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
6 6 Defendants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MTP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-02136 JRT/KMM. (MTP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9050510) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/1/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet