California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:22-cv-00722
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2022
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 21LBCP00396
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2022 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Long Beach Unified School District
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Jill Baker
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jay Camerino
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eddie Cruz
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Jonathan Hayes
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mona Merlo
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edward Samuels
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sashya Tullo
Represented By
Joseph W Cheung
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Venice Jaymes Gamble
an Individual 222 West 6th Street, Suite 417
San Pedro, CA 90731


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
32 32 misc Receipt Tue 05/31 2:26 PM
Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court, Long Beach on May 3, 2022. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
31 31 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Wed 05/11 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Text Only Entry erroneously filed in this case. Parties shall disregard docket 30 . (iv)
Related: [-]
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 05/11 10:01 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
29 29 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 04/27 9:59 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, LONG BEACH, NO.21LBCP00396 (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
28 28 order Amend/Correct Remand Case to State Court Wed 04/27 9:51 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REMANDING CASE. The Court finds removal was proper here because Gamble asserts a federal claim andDefendants did not waive the right to remove. The Court DENIES Gambles Motion to Remand10 . Nevertheless, Defendants concede that remand may still be appropriate based on Gamble's Motion for Leave to Amend to dismiss his federal claims. As Defendants do not oppose Gamble's motion for leave to amend, the Court deems the lack of opposition as consent to granting the motion for leave to amend and GRANTS Gamble leave, in part only, solely to the extent Gamble seeks leave to dismiss his federal claim.. Accordingly, Gambles 42 U.S.C. 1983 claim and his claim for declaratory relief, to the extent it is premised on federal law, are hereby DISMISSED24 . Finally, as all federal claims have been dismissed, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims. Consequently, the Court REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, 275 Magnolia Avenue, Long Beach, CA 90802. All dates and deadlines are VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
27 27 respm Exhibit to Motion Wed 04/06 9:16 PM
EXHIBIT A to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL CAUSES OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS VIOLATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (42 U.S.C. 1983) CLAIM 24 (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
26 26 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/06 8:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble, re Memorandum in Support of Motion,25 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL CAUSES OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS VIOLATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (42 U.S.C. 1983) CLAIM 24 served on 04/06/2022.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service
25 25 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 04/06 8:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL CAUSES OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS VIOLATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (42 U.S.C. 1983) CLAIM 24 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. (Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/06 8:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL CAUSES OF ACTION, AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS VIOLATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (42 U.S.C. 1983) CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. Motion set for hearing on 5/2/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 03/31 10:19 AM
The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND10 , scheduled for April 4, 2022 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
22 22 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 03/14 12:20 PM
Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District. (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
21 21 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 03/01 12:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble, re Exhibit to Motion19 , Exhibit to Motion18 , Exhibit to Motion20 , Exhibit to Motion16 , Exhibit to Motion17 served on 03/01/2022.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit POS with Sheet of Service Recipients & Parties
20 20 respm Exhibit to Motion Tue 03/01 12:47 PM
EXHIBIT 05 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
19 19 respm Exhibit to Motion Tue 03/01 12:46 PM
EXHIBIT 04 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 respm Exhibit to Motion Tue 03/01 12:45 PM
EXHIBIT 03 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
17 17 respm Exhibit to Motion Tue 03/01 12:44 PM
EXHIBIT 02 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 respm Exhibit to Motion Tue 03/01 12:43 PM
EXHIBIT 01 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble.(Gamble, Venice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 24, 2022
15 15 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Thu 02/24 3:58 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting9 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 02/24 1:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: First, on February 22, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand Case without selecting a date for the hearing10 . Under Central District Local Rules 6 and 7 and this Court's Courtroom Rules, a party filing a motion is expected to select a date for the hearing on the motion. Nevertheless, the Court hereby SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand on April 4, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Second, the Court rejected Plaintiff's Exhibits to the Motion to Remand because they were filed separately and lacked caption pages13 . As soon as Plaintiff is setup to file documents electronicallyand in no case later than March 7, 2022Plaintiff shall file the Exhibits to the Motion to Remand, complete with the required caption pages. Third, the Court observes that in applying for permission to file documents electronically in this case, Plaintiff failed to file a proposed order as required by Central District Local Rule 52-4.19 . The Court will issue a separate Order granting Plaintiff's application to file electronically, but in so doing, the Court warns Plaintiff that continued violations of the rules of court such as the violations described above will result in the striking or disregarding of Plaintiff's papers. Plaintiff will be held to the same standard as any other litigant, and the Court trusts that Plaintiff's filings will conform to all applicable standards and rules. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
13 13 order Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A) Wed 02/23 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, ORDERING Exhibits submitted by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble received on 2/23/22 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: LR 83-2.5 No Letters to the Judge; OTHER: Documents must either be attached to a filing (your motion) as 1-document, or filed separately with a caption page. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
12 12 respm Declaration (Motion related) Wed 02/23 9:27 AM
DECLARATION of VENICE J. GAMBLE, II in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 02/23 9:21 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. (lc) Modified on 2/23/2022 (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand Case to State Court Wed 02/23 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. (lc)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Wed 02/23 9:09 AM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Venice Jaymes Gamble. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 02/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-00722 ODW(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
7 7 misc Statement Wed 02/16 4:01 PM
STATEMENT Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 02/03 12:38 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/02 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Pendency filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District. (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 trial Jury Demand Wed 02/02 4:41 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District.. (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/02 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District, (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/02 4:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District. (Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/02 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21LBCP00396 Receipt No: ACACDC-32728793 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District. (Attorney Joseph W Cheung added to party Long Beach Unified School District(pty:dft))(Cheung, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 02/03 12:29 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Venice J. Gamble in Los Anglees Superior Court on 12/30/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 02/03 12:36 PM
NON CONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Jill Baker, Jay Camerino, Eddie Cruz, Jonathan Hayes, Long Beach Unified School District, Mona Merlo, Edward Samuels, Sashya Tullo, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil)
Related: [-]