Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:22-cv-10209
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2022
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2022 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Elizabeth M. Watza
Msu Office Of General Counsel
contact info
Keith Clark
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Eric M. Jamison
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Gasper
Represented By
Scott L. Damich
Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Elizabeth M. Watza
Msu Office Of General Counsel
contact info
Keith Clark
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Eric M. Jamison
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
Alyson Oliver
Oliver Law Group P.C. 1647 W. Big Beaver Rd.
Troy, MI 48084
Represented By
Alyson L. Oliver
Oliver Law Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe H
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Roe
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Doe
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe G
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe F
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe E
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe D
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe C
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe B
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe A
Represented By
Paul D. Reingold
University Of Michigan
contact info
Miriam J. Aukerman
American Civil Liberties Union Of Michigan
contact info
Rohit Rajan
Aclu Of Michigan
contact info
Roshna B. Keen
Loevy & Loevy
contact info
Daniel S. Korobkin
American Civil Liberties Union Fund Of Michigan
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2023
OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 100 Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (HRya)
GPO Sep 27 2024
ned by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EPar)OPINION and ORDER (1) Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 123) and (2) Granting in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 129). Joint Statement due by 10/18/2024 Sig
GPO Mar 26 2025
OPINION & ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT (Dkt. 167) - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER granting Joint 174 Motion to Correct Technical Errors in Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
GPO Apr 22 2025
AMENDED 172 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
190 190 28 pgs trial Exhibit Tue 05/06 11:54 AM
EXHIBIT 1 to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay (CORRECTED) re189 Supplemental Brief, by All Plaintiffs (Aukerman, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
189 189 23 pgs respm Supplemental Brief Mon 05/05 10:30 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re186 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Aukerman, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Guzman Declaration,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 2 - Kardasz MSP amicus brief (excerpts)
188 188 10 pgs respm Supplemental Brief Mon 05/05 3:29 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re186 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Stay Judgment on Counts I, II, and XI Pending Appeal filed by James Grady, Gretchen Whitmer. (Jamison, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
187 187 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/01 11:44 AM
ORDER granting185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KCas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
186 186 1 pgs minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Wed 04/30 4:42 PM
ORDER Following April 30, 2025 Motion Hearing re173 MOTION to Stay. ( Optional Supplemental Briefs due by 5/5/2025 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KCas)
Related: [-]
185 185 motion Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 04/30 12:47 PM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Daniel S. Korobkin by All Plaintiffs. (Korobkin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/30 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2025 re173 MOTION to Stay re172 Judgment Defendants Motion to Stay Judgment on Counts I, II, And XI Pending Appeal Expedited Consideration Requested and Brief in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay Counts I, II, and XI of Judgment with Certificate of filed by Gretchen Whitmer, James Grady. (Court Reporter: April Kurtz) (HRya)
Related: [-]