Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers, Inc. et al v. Nordman
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:21-bk-81007
Lead BK case is: 8:21-bk-81007
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brian S Kruse |
Case #: | 8:22-ap-08004 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Richard A Nordman
1109 Howard Street #503
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Hawk Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:09 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 09/05 9:21 AM
Adversary Case Closed 22-08004 BSK Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers, Inc. et al v. Nordman et al CASE DISMISSED 8/21/2024 . (ble) |