Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01173
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2022 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
CORIEL HONORAY STEPHENS
Represented By
DANA A LIZIK
Johnson Law Group - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/01 3:23 PM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/02 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/02 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6657223.), filed by CORIEL HONORAY STEPHENS. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]