Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01201
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2022
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2022 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ARTT MANN
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
5 5 9 pgs order Order Tue 06/28 12:34 PM
ORDER - The Court finds no adequate grounds for reconsideration and plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/28/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 05/09 10:58 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION for Reconsideration re3 Order Dismissing Case (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 motion Reconsideration Fri 05/06 3:27 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re3 Order Dismissing Case, by ARTT MANN. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ashlea Schwarz,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6
Monday, May 02, 2022
3 3 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/05 2:17 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/02 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by ARTT MANN (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/02 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6657874.), filed by ARTT MANN. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet