Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 1:22-cv-00398
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2022
Terminated:Dec 27, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2022 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Gwinnett County School District
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Fisher Kinsinger
Thompson, Sweeny, Kinsinger & Pereira, P.C.
contact info
Jaaonne Jaudree Gadson-Jackson
Thompson, Sweeny, Kinsinger & Pereira, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kono D. Smith
Represented By
Christopher G Moorman
Moorman Pieschel, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/22 3:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Kono D. Smith. (Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order to Dismiss Tue 12/27 4:50 PM
Order to Dismiss without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action. If this matter is not reopened by the parties within sixty (60) days it will be deemed to have been dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/27/2022. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/27 4:51 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
34 34 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 12/16 3:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III: Settlement Conference held on 12/16/2022. Case settled. (Tape #Zoom) (cem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
33 33 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/15 1:11 PM
ORDER directing the parties to appear for mediation on December 16, 2022, at 9:00 a.m., via Zoom. The Court will send meeting instructions to all parties via email prior to the mediation. Each party shall provide, to Judge Larkins only, a Confidential Mediation Statement by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, December 9, 2022 via email. To expedite the mediation process, Judge Larkins will speak with counsel for each side by telephone prior to the mediation. Judge Larkins will call Plaintiff's counsel on December 15, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., and Defendant's counsel on December 15, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/15/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/09 4:17 PM
NOTICE by Gwinnett County School District of Subpoena to Back In The Game Physical Therapy(Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena,
Att: 2 Attachment A to Subpoena
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/09 4:14 PM
NOTICE by Gwinnett County School District of Subpoena to Northeast Georgia Physicians Group(Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena,
Att: 2 Attachment A to Subpoena
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Stay Tue 11/08 3:24 PM
ORDER granting29 Joint Motion Requesting Mediation Referral and granting29 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall take part in mediation at a time and place to be scheduled by the Magistrate Judge assigned as the mediator. It is further ORDERED the discovery period is stayed pending mediation. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court within five days of the outcome of the settlement conference. In the event mediation is unsuccessful, the discovery period shall be extended for a period of 30 days from the date of mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/08/2022. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Settlement Judge Tue 11/08 3:25 PM
CASE REFERRED to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Stay Mon 11/07 2:55 PM
Joint MOTION Referral to Mediation , Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Deadlines by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 2:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Amended Initial Disclosures by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 11/01 3:20 PM
STATUS REPORT by Kono D. Smith. (Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/27 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Thu 09/22 12:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Deposition Notice of J. Alvin Wilbanks by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/21 1:18 PM
ORDER granting the parties'23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery period is extended until November 28, 2022 and all subsequent deadlines are extended accordingly. The Court cannot extend the discovery period indefinitely for Mr. Wilbanks' deposition, particularly as it has yet to be scheduled, for Plaintiff to then take additional depositions. The Court therefore directs that J. Alvin Wilbanks' deposition shall be noticed or subpoenaed and taken NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 1, 2022. All other depositions shall be taken NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 28, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 1, 2022 setting forth what depositions they have completed as of that date and what depositions remain to be taken and the dates those depositions are scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/21/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 09/20 2:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Gwinnett County School District. (Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
22 22 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 09/07 4:55 PM
Amended Initial Disclosures by Gwinnett County School District.(Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Mon 08/29 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Gwinnett County School District.(Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/26 10:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
19 19 misc Leave of Absence Wed 08/17 2:59 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 16, 2022, through and including January 3, 2023 filed by Christopher G Moorman. (Moorman, Christopher) Modified on 8/17/2022 to edit docket text (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Mon 08/15 1:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
17 17 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 08/05 4:08 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Kono D. Smith filed by Gwinnett County School District (Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Wed 07/06 9:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
15 15 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 06/21 10:34 AM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 06/17/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
14 14 motion Protective Order Fri 06/17 4:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Gwinnett County School District. (Kinsinger, Elizabeth Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Thu 04/21 10:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1st Interrogatories and 1st Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
12 12 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 04/14 4:09 PM
Initial Disclosures by Gwinnett County School District.(Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/14 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaaonne Jaudree Gadson-Jackson on behalf of Gwinnett County School District (Gadson-Jackson, Jaaonne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
10 10 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 04/07 1:55 PM
Initial Disclosures by Kono D. Smith.(Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
9 9 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Fri 04/01 10:33 AM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 04/01/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/01 10:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties'7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties' request for a period of six months to conduct discovery is granted and discovery is extended up to and including September 26, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 04/01/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
7 7 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 03/31 10:44 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kono D. Smith. (Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 03/31 9:56 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and serve the Initial Disclosures within 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 03/31/2022. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 03/29 10:12 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Kono D. Smith. (Moorman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
4 4 misc Leave of Absence Mon 02/28 5:41 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/6/22, 4/7/22, 4/8/22, 6/6/22, 6/7/22, 6/8/22, 6/9/22, 6/10/22, 6/13/22, 6/14/22, 6/15/22, 9/16/22, 9/19/22, 9/20/22, 9/21/22, 9/22/22, 9/23/22, 9/26/22, by Elizabeth Ann Fisher Kinsinger. (Kinsinger, Elizabeth Ann)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/28 5:30 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Gwinnett County School District. Discovery ends on 7/28/2022.(Kinsinger, Elizabeth Ann)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 02/02 8:01 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Gwinnett County School District. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/02 8:00 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kono D. Smith. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11558429)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/2/2022 to correct Receipt Number (eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet