North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:N C Tilley, Jr
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:19-cv-00561
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2019
Terminated:Nov 10, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Feb 03, 2022 10:08 PM EST
Defendant
B & D INTEGRATED HEALTH SERVICES
Defendant
LAUREN DURANT
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MCMULLEN
Represented By
BRIAN L. KINSLEY
Crumley Roberts, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
CASSANDRA L. CRAWFORD
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Mdnc
contact info
REBECCA A. MAYER
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Monday, April 17, 2023
28 28 2 pgs misc Mail Returned Mon 04/17 3:31 PM
Envelope Containing27 Order addressed to MICHAEL MCMULLEN 2505 HITCHCOCK DRIVE, DURHAM, NC 27705 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because RETURN TO SENDER. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/10 11:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN SERVICE signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 11/10/2022; that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants B&D Integrated Health Services and Lauren Durant. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
utility Case Referred to Judge Thu 10/13 1:00 PM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/19 11:11 AM
ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 8/19/2022; that should the Relator pursue this matter further, the parties shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action, including supporting memoranda, upon the United States and the State of North Carolina, as provided for in 31 U.S.C. § 3730(c)(3) and N.C. Gen. Stat. § 1-609(f). The United States and the State of North Carolina may order any deposition transcripts and are entitled to intervene in this action, for good cause, at any time. Should Relator pursue this matter further, the parties shall serve all notices of appeal upon the United States and the State of North Carolina. Should Relator pursue this matter further, all orders of the Court shall be sent to the United States and the State of North Carolina and should Relator or any Defendant propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the Court will solicit the written consent of the United States and the State of North Carolina before ruling or granting its approval. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail this order to the Relator's address as reflected on the certificate of service in Document23 . (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
utility Case Referred to Judge Wed 05/11 10:50 AM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (See25 Order) (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/01 1:33 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 3/1/2022; that Plaintiff's counsel is granted permission to withdraw as counsel of record for Relator Michael McMullen. FURTHER ORDERED that a 30-day stay of proceedings be enacted to afford Mr. McMullen time to find new counsel. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Submitted Tue 03/01 11:23 AM
Motions Submitted to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR re:23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney BRIAN L. KINSLEY And For Stay of Proceedings . (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
24 24 5 pgs respm Brief Wed 02/02 1:37 PM
BRIEF re23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney BRIAN L. KINSLEY And For Stay of Proceedings by Plaintiff MICHAEL MCMULLEN filed by MICHAEL MCMULLEN. (KINSLEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 02/02 1:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney BRIAN L. KINSLEY And For Stay of Proceedings by on behalf of MICHAEL MCMULLEN. Responses due by 2/16/2022(KINSLEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 20, 2021
22 22 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 12/20/2021 as set out. The Complaint be unsealed and, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, Relator either serves the Complaint upon the Defendant or files a voluntary dismissal; Docket Entries 4 , 7 , 13 , 16 , and 19 shall remain sealed; The Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal all other Docket Entries. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR RE:21 Notice. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
21 21 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Declination(MAYER, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
20 20 SEALED ORDER re18 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for extension of intervention decision and seal . Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 8/3/2021. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Motions Submitted to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR re:18 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for extension of intervention decision and seal . (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
18 18 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for extension of intervention decision and seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(MAYER, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 01, 2021
17 17 SEALED ORDER re15 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for Extension of Seal/Intervention Deadline . Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 2/1/2021. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 30, 2021
15 15 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for Extension of Seal/Intervention Deadline by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
14 14 EX PARTE/SEALED ORDER granting12 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for extension of seal/intervention deadline . Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 8/5/2020. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
12 12 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for extension of seal/intervention deadline by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 23, 2020
11 11 SEALED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REBECCA A. MAYER on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
10 10 SEALED ORDER granting9 SEALED MOTION. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 3/17/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
9 9 SEALED MOTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2020
8 8 SEALED ORDER re6 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 2/27/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
6 6 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for Extension of Time by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back
Thursday, August 08, 2019
5 5 SEALED ORDER re3 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 8/8/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
Motions Submitted:3 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
3 3 EX PARTE/SEALED MOTION for Extension of Time by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 31, 2019
2 2 1 pgs CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against B & D INTEGRATED HEALTH SERVICES, LAUREN DURANT, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL MCMULLEN, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 400.00. Receipt number: NCM046030. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
Related: [-]