Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Referred: Michael T Morrissey
Case #: 2:22-cv-00165
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1355 Petition for Return of Property
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2022
Terminated:Aug 10, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, August 19, 2022
22 22 misc Mail Returned Mon 08/22 9:24 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Adnan Ijaz. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not in Custody. Document numbers 20 and 21. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
21 21 order Clerks Judgment Wed 08/10 10:57 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed August 10, 2022, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (REK)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 08/10 10:54 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Injunction1 and this action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss17 and Plaintiff's motions (Docs.11 and16 ), and the Motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/09/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
19 19 misc Mail Returned Thu 07/14 2:11 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Adnan Ijaz. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Unlclaimed. Document number 18. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
18 18 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Tue 06/28 9:19 AM
ORDER - 1. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (doc.17 ) by July 25, 2022. 2. Defendant may file a reply within fifteen days after service of Plaintiff's response. 3. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the motion to dismiss will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 6/27/2022. (LAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Fri 06/24 5:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order by United States Department of Homeland Security/Immigrations and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations. (Nickerson, Theo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/13 9:03 AM
MOTION for Court Order by Adnan Ijaz. (4 Pages) (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA Wed 06/08 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Theo Nickerson appearing for United States Department of Homeland Security/Immigrations and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations. . (Nickerson, Theo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
14 14 service Service Executed Tue 05/17 12:12 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Complaint, and Order upon United States Attorney General on 5/12/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
13 13 service Service Executed Thu 05/12 2:27 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States Department of Homeland Security/Immigrations and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Complaint/Order upon US Attorney District of Arizona, ATTN: Civil Process Clerk on 5/10/2022. (LAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
12 12 service Service Executed Thu 05/12 11:27 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States Department of Homeland Security/Immigrations and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Complaint/Order upon US Department of Homeland Security, ICE, Enforcement and Removal Operations, Phoenix, AZ on 5//8/2022. (LAD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
11 11 motion Hearing Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/10 12:39 PM
MOTION for Speedier Court Proceeding and MOTION for Final Court Order by Adnan Ijaz. (LAD) (1 page, styled as a letter to Judge Morrissey)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Tue 05/10 12:33 PM
Letter from Adnan Ijaz to Judge Morrissey Related [+]. (LAD) (1 page. Note: Service packets were sent by certified mail on 5/5/2022 (doc 9 ))
Related: [-] delay with service packet
Thursday, May 05, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 05/05 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security/Immigrations and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
7 7 service Summons Submitted Thu 05/05 3:07 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Adnan Ijaz. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/26 12:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must show cause no later than May 10, 2022, for why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 4/26/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order (Service Packet) Mon 03/21 1:10 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint1 , this Order, and summonses for Defendant Department of Homeland Security/Immigration and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations and the United States. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The Clerk of Court will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. If Plaintiff does not complete service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant and the United States within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed. Upon receipt of the service packet, the Clerk of Court must send by certified mail a copy of the Summonses, the Complaint, and this Order to (1) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona; (2) the Attorney General of the United States; and (3) Defendant Department of Homeland Security/Immigration and Customs Enforcement/Enforcement and Removal Operations, pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). See document for further details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/21/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/14 3:07 PM
Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number PHX236038. PAID IN FULL. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
3 3 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 02/09 3:52 PM
ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/9/2022. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Wed 02/02 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/02 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Adnan Ijaz. (33 Pages and Envelope)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope