Original Case: 1:21-cv-06428

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-00206
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 07, 2023 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Richmond University Medical Center
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Alexander Usorov, M.D.
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Vaithilingham Aruthasan, M.D.
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Obi Valentine, M.D.
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Roland Ngum, M.D.
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Annette Netsama, M.D.
Represented By
Dylan Braverman
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Jessie Saverimuttu, M.D.
Represented By
Megan Alice Lawless
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
contact info
David Bloom
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michele Walker, individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Harry Walker, deceased
Represented By
Brian J. Isaac
Pollack, Pollack, Isaac & DeCicco, LLP
contact info
Antigone Curis
Antigone Curis, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/07/2023 4:32 AM EDT
Monday, January 31, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Vaithilingham Aruthasan, Annette Netsama, Roland Ngum, Richmond University Medical Center, Alexander Usorov and Obi Valentine, FILED. [3254366] [22-206]--[Edited 02/09/2022 by TT] [Entered: 02/02/2022 11:02 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Vaithilingham Aruthasan, Annette Netsama, Roland Ngum, Richmond University Medical Center, Alexander Usorov and Obi Valentine, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15244045., FILED.[3254374] [22-206]--[Edited 02/09/2022 by TT] [Entered: 02/02/2022 11:07 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT ELECTRONIC TEXT ORDER, dated 01/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3254380] [22-206] [Entered: 02/02/2022 11:11 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3256091] [22-206] [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:07 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
9 9 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jessie Saverimuttu, FILED. [3258172] [22-269] [Entered: 02/09/2022 01:12 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED