Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:22-cv-00137
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Terminated:Aug 18, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 3:52 AM CDT
Defendant
McCain Foods USA Inc
Represented By
Elizabeth A Odian
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Mitchell W Quick
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Paul E Benson
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Solem
Represented By
James A Walcheske
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
Scott S Luzi
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 18, 2023
50 50 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 08/18 11:32 AM
ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 8/18/2023 granting37 Motion for Final Approval of Collective and Class Action Settlement,40 Motion for Service Award, and41 Motion for Attorney Fees. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
49 49 minutes Fairness Hearing Fri 08/18 11:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Fairness Hearing held on 8/18/2023. The Court approves the settlement, attorney fees and service award. (Tape #Zoom 081823) (lh)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Fri 08/18 11:34 AM
Case Closed. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 08/16 10:35 AM
UPDATED NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 8/18/2023 at 09:00 AM is CONVERTED to Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The parties shall call the courts Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 , use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308 , press # to bypass Participant ID, and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerks Office at 920-455-7381. (cc: all counsel) (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
48 48 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/15 4:45 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING46 Joint Rule 7(h) Motion for Leave to Appear at the Fairness Hearing Telephonically, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 08/15/2023. The Clerk is directed to convert the August 18, 2023 hearing as requested. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]