Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:21-bk-12437

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Wayne E Johnson
Case #: 6:22-ap-01009
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Terminated:Dec 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Armando Frausto
5497 West Tonopah Cv
West Jordan, UT 84081
Represented By
Armando Frausto
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
34145 Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 359
Dana Point, CA 92629
Represented By
Hydee J Riggs
Law Office Of Hydee J Riggs
contact info
Trustee
Robert Whitmore (TR)
3600 Lime St Ste 616
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/27 3:07 PM
Adversary Case 6:22-ap-1009 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (YG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
15 15 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 10/21 1:58 PM
Document Hearing Held - Vacated Related [+] (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, October 13, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/13 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
13 13 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/11 7:53 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/11/2022 Related [+]. (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
Saturday, October 08, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Sat 10/08 12:41 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Request for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
11 11 misc Proof of service Tue 05/10 12:35 PM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, May 08, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/08 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 06, 2022
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 05/06 2:29 PM
Status conference and scheduling order. See order for details Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/6/2022. (YG)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 05/06 1:58 PM
Hearing re status conference (Other) (AP Case) Related [+]Pre-Trial Hearing to be held on 10/20/2022 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 304 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (YG)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, May 05, 2022
9 9 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 05/06 3:16 PM
Document Hearing Held - Pre-Trial Set For 10/20/22 at 1:30 P.M. Related [+] (YG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, April 07, 2022
7 7 misc Status report Thu 04/07 3:10 PM
Status report (Joint) with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-] 4 Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case)
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/02 2:23 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Armando Frausto. (Heston, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/10 5:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee 2/10/2022 (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Thu 02/03 11:59 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/5/2022 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 02/03 11:58 AM
Summons Issued on Armando Frausto Date Issued 2/3/2022, Answer Due 3/7/2022 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/5/2022 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee
2 2 notice Notice Thu 02/03 9:56 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/03 9:51 AM
Adversary case 6:22-ap-01009. Complaint by Robert S. Whitmore, Chapter 7 Trustee against Armando Frausto. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Riggs, Hydee)
Related: [-]