Connecticut District Court
Judge:Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:22-cv-00203
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
AeroSimple LLC
Represented By
Jennifer A Pedevillano
Halloran & Sage Llp- New Haven
contact info
Joseph G. Fortner, Jr.
Halloran & Sage LLP
contact info
Defendant
Visweswara Rao Viswanadha
Represented By
Jennifer A Pedevillano
Halloran & Sage Llp- New Haven
contact info
Joseph G. Fortner, Jr.
Halloran & Sage LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grey Wall Software, LLC
Represented By
Patrick J. McHugh
Patrick Mchugh Law LLC
contact info
James M. Steinberg
Brady Mcguire & Steinberg, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Veoci Inc.
Represented By
Patrick J. McHugh
Patrick Mchugh Law LLC
contact info
James M. Steinberg
Brady Mcguire & Steinberg, P.C.
contact info

GPO Dec 02 2022
ORDER granting 38 Motion for Alternative Service on Defendant; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss. See attached document for the Court's detailed ruling. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 12/2/2022. (Johnson, Alicia)
GPO Sep 07 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 9/7/2023. (Fries, J.)
GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration. See attached order. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 4/14/2025. (Swann, J)

Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
128 128 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/22 9:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 29, 2025 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO PARAGRAPH (D) OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT127 Response by AeroSimple LLC, Visweswara Rao Viswanadha. (Pedevillano, Jennifer)
Related: [-]