Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01288
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
STEVEN REPP
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 4:54 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/03 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by STEVEN REPP (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/03 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6661322.), filed by STEVEN REPP. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet