Baer et al v. Duff & Phelps, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00994 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Duff & Phelps, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
Duff & Phelps LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Baer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernard E. Francois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mordehai Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Naamith Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reuven Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yehudith Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zohar Heiblum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Isaacs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Loughman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seth Rosenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rosenbloom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sierra Springs Diversified Income Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eytan Turjeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wing Point Investments LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
2012 DPDS Fund L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Jay Akana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alison Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blair Ambach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Chuckrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Frank Aronov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atkins Investment Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry P. Garrison, trustee of the Barry P. Garrison Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beri Lynn Polonitza, trustee of the Beri Lynn Polonitza Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Blinderman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Etienne Boillot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa D. Gagnum Boillot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Boniecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Horowitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anne Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher John Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John W. Buttrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Campise
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Campolo, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chancellor Capital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Cotton Harrold IV, trustee of the C. Cotton Harrold IV Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph S. Chasen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher John Burke, trustee of the Matrix Capital Advisors LLC Employee Savings Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Yap Chua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Crump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Michael
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Decker, Jr., trustee of the 2017 Decker Family Irrevocable Gift Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Decker, Sr., trustee for the Mary Louise Decker Family GST Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Decker, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pareshkumar Desai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dimitri Katamanin, trustee of the Four Season's Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alia Driscoll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Driscoll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Driscoll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Drumm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony V. Dub
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dusty47 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Atkins, trustee of the Edward M. Atkins Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis J. Fitzsimons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Four J Family LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Armour Williamson, trustee of the Frances Armour Williamson TTEE Revocable Trust of Frances Armour Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Goebel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessa Ann Goebel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Marie Grein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Vance Hancock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy A.D. Hancock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harminder Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harmony Investments LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Harrigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Harrold, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaux Marbury Harrold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Helen Henske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Nelson-Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Inna Koehler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Lisa Horween Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Nancy Horween Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Goldberg, trustee of the Jeffrey M. Goldberg Trust u/a dtd 08/01/1995
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Mvongo, trustee of the Jennifer M. Mvongo Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John D. Marschall, trustee of the John D. Marschall Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John H. Heuberger, trustee of the WBK 2012 Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L MacCarthy, trustee of the John Leland MacCarthy Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Muehlstein, trustee of the Peer Pedersen Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Stulgis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Stulgis, trustee of the Jonathan W. Stulgis Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Campolo, Jr., trustee of the Joseph P Campolo Jr. Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Kaplan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael R. Kaskie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dimitri Katamanin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chanda Mehta Kero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niloufer Kero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sameer Kero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawkat Kero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kilrea Family Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl John Henry Koehler, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Sue Koehler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kreiseder Family LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LTR I LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter T. Lambrakis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy K Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lillian Leong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liza Reynolds Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loeb Holding Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheffee Lulkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mari Christopherson, trustee of the Mari Louisa Christopherson Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Ordower, trustee of the Mark Ordower Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Polonitza, trustee of the Jard Polonitza Separate Property Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William McKenna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Narendrakumar Mehta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarita Mehta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Smita Mehta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Mengel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John D. Michael
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Harrigan, trustee for the Michael J. Harrigan Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Mueckler, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
N. Kero Investments, LTD., LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Nadel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Lynn Morton, trustee of the Harrold Family Dynasty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Patrick Nedelka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niloufer Kero, trustee of Niloufer Kero Revocable Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ordower Investments
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orla Cunningham LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Palamine Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Papesch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramesh Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Booth, trustee of the Laurence O. Booth Irrevocable Family Trust of 2012
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Booth, trustee of the Patricia Booth Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armando Pauker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Blinderman, trustee of the Paul Blinderman Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pearlene Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peer Pedersen, Jr., trustee of the Declaration of Trust of Peer Pedersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter J. McDonald, trustee of the Peter J. McDonald Trust DTD 04/22/2010
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Porpora, trustee of the Phillip Porpora Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Lance Polonitza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Malcolm Potts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RJDC Management Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rajesh Kannah Ramanujam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priya Ravi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas F. Reiser, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ridge Sampson, trustee of the Ridge Sampson Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Brilliant, trustee of the Brilliant Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eleanor Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Rockwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Berman, trustee of the Ronald Berman Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald McLeod, trustee of the Ronald McLeod Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Anthony Ronan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John P. Roy, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruthmarie Connor, trustee of the Rollin Polonitza Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. Kero Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAS ARDIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SSSB Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sally Jo Morris, trustee of the Suzanne Kanis Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James E. Salter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sameer Kero, trustee of the Flexedge Investment Management Defined Benefit Pension Plan & Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Kilrea, trustee of the Scott Kilrea Trust U/A DTD 04/14/1997
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Seeds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shai Wininger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Sharman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shefee Lulkin & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherwood Guernsey, trustee of the Carol C. Guernsey Irrevocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Michael Silva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Harrold, trustee of the Stephanie A. Harrold Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Guy Stokes, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Strange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stuart E. Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Max Luis Tejada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Nelson-Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vasundhara Tolia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Carrie G. Cox TUW Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Harriet C. Collis TUA Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Osman Uslu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon James Armour, trustee of the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 04/04/1988 and the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 08/14/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Clewell, trustee of the Ronald J. Sloane Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trinh-Mai N. Vo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bret M. Walberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warrington Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris J. Wik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wayne Hancock III, trustee of the George B. Hancock Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Witlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bennet Woodward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yiming Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
85 | 85
![]() ORDER: PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court hereby dismisses this entire action, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. IT IS SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/12/2024) (ks) |
|
utility
Case Stay Lifted
Wed 11/13 11:25 AM
Case Stay Lifted. (ks) |
||
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
84 | 84
![]() PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Rachel Heiblum, Yehudith Heiblum, Pearlene Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Inna Koehler, Terry Nelson-Johnson, Stuart E. Lucas, Alison Patel, Zohar Heiblum, Lillian Leong, Heather Thompson, Jonathan Stulgis, Priya Ravi, Philip Nadel, Peter T. Lambrakis, John P. Roy, Jr, Margaret Rockwell, Jack Frank Aronov, Lisa D. Gagnum Boillot, Reuven Heiblum, Chancellor Capital, Blair Ambach, Theodore Strange, Christopher John Burke, trustee of the Matrix Capital Advisors LLC Employee Savings Plan, Eleanor Robinson, Rajesh Kannah Ramanujam, Palamine Holdings LLC, Etienne Boillot, Shai Wininger, John W. Buttrick, Greg Isaacs, Warrington Capital LLC, John Vance Hancock, Alia Driscoll, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Harriet C. Collis TUA Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Mary Helen Henske, SAS ARDIS, Michael Harrigan, John H. Heuberger, trustee of the WBK 2012 Trust, Neal Driscoll, Dennis J. Fitzsimons, Bernard E. Francois, Osman Uslu, Armando Pauker, Vasundhara Tolia, William Wayne Hancock III, trustee of the George B. Hancock Trust, Loeb Holding Corporation, Michael Harrigan, trustee for the Michael J. Harrigan Trust, Michael Driscoll, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Carrie G. Cox TUW Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Nancy A.D. Hancock, Chanda Mehta Kero, Sameer Kero, trustee of the Flexedge Investment Management Defined Benefit Pension Plan & Trust, Bennet Woodward, Narendrakumar Mehta, Smita Mehta, Etienne Boillot(trustees of the GST Trust ), Sarita Mehta, Pareshkumar Desai, Sameer Kero, Shawkat Kero, S. Kero Limited Partnership, Seth Rosenberg, Niloufer Kero, Niloufer Kero, trustee of Niloufer Kero Revocable Family Trust, Anthony V. Dub, Michael Witlin, Bret M. Walberg, Dimitri Katamanin, trustee of the Four Season's Trust, N. Kero Investments, LTD., LLLP, Dimitri Katamanin, Deborah Loughman, David Malcolm Potts, Ronald McLeod, trustee of the Ronald McLeod Revocable Trust, Jennifer Mvongo, trustee of the Jennifer M. Mvongo Revocable Trust, Trinh-Mai N. Vo, Max Luis Tejada, Ramesh Patel, Gerald Guy Stokes, Jr, James E. Salter, Ridge Sampson, trustee of the Ridge Sampson Revocable Trust, Aaron Michael Silva, John Miller, Andrew Baer, Stacy K Li, Julie Lewis, Daniel Michael, Thomas F. Reiser, Jr, John D. Michael, SSSB Partnership, RJDC Management Company LLC, James Sharman, Robert Brilliant, trustee of the Brilliant Family Trust, Jessa Ann Goebel, Jerome Yap Chua, Barry P. Garrison, trustee of the Barry P. Garrison Trust, Harminder Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Orla Cunningham LLC, Victoria Clewell, trustee of the Ronald J. Sloane Family Trust, Stephen Jay Akana, Stephanie Marie Grein, Doris J. Wik, Frances Armour Williamson, trustee of the Frances Armour Williamson TTEE Revocable Trust of Frances Armour Williamson, Yiming Zhang, Sierra Springs Diversified Income Fund, LP, Eugene Goebel, Liza Reynolds Limited Partnership, Brent Horowitz, Phillip Porpora, trustee of the Phillip Porpora Trust, Kimberly Seeds, Jonathan Stulgis, trustee of the Jonathan W. Stulgis Family Trust, Scott Anthony Ronan, John L MacCarthy, trustee of the John Leland MacCarthy Revocable Trust, Sheffee Lulkin, Karl John Henry Koehler, III(trustees of the Jay Koehler and Inna Koehler Living Trust), Holly Nelson-Johnson, John Muehlstein, trustee of the Peer Pedersen Trust, Ordower Investments, James Papesch, Beri Lynn Polonitza, trustee of the Beri Lynn Polonitza Revocable Trust, Steven Patrick Nedelka, Mark Ordower, trustee of the Mark Ordower Trust, Shefee Lulkin & Associates, Inc., Robert Mueckler, II, Barry Lance Polonitza, Peter J. McDonald, trustee of the Peter J. McDonald Trust DTD 04/22/2010, William McKenna, Nancy Mengel, Peer Pedersen, Jr., trustee of the Declaration of Trust of Peer Pedersen, Sandra Sue Koehler, Ruthmarie Connor, trustee of the Rollin Polonitza Family Trust, Karl John Henry Koehler, III, Mary Polonitza, trustee of the Jard Polonitza Separate Property Trust, LTR I LLC, John D. Marschall, trustee of the John D. Marschall Trust, Kreiseder Family LLC, Dusty47 LLC, Four J Family LLC, Stephanie Harrold, trustee of the Stephanie A. Harrold Revocable Trust, Kilrea Family Investments, LLC, Harmony Investments LLC, Charles Harrold, III, Barbara Drumm, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Patricia Booth Revocable Trust, Margaux Marbury Harrold, Ronald Kaplan, Charles Cotton Harrold IV, trustee of the C. Cotton Harrold IV Investment Trust, Michael R. Kaskie, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Lisa Horween Kelly, Scott Kilrea, trustee of the Scott Kilrea Trust U/A DTD 04/14/1997, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Laurence O. Booth Irrevocable Family Trust of 2012, 2012 DPDS Fund L.P., Sally Jo Morris, trustee of the Suzanne Kanis Revocable Trust, Jeffrey Goldberg, trustee of the Jeffrey M. Goldberg Trust u/a dtd 08/01/1995, David Decker, Jr., trustee of the 2017 Decker Family Irrevocable Gift Trust, Nancy Lynn Morton, trustee of the Harrold Family Dynasty Trust, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Nancy Horween Trust, David Decker, Sr., trustee for the Mary Louise Decker Family GST Trust, David Decker, Sr, Phillip Crump, Sherwood Guernsey, trustee of the Carol C. Guernsey Irrevocable Trust, Amy Chuckrow, Mari Christopherson, trustee of the Mari Louisa Christopherson Trust, Joseph S. Chasen, Joseph Campolo, Jr., trustee of the Joseph P Campolo Jr. Revocable Trust, Joseph Campolo, Jr, Francis Campise, Christopher John Burke, John Burke, Anne Burke, Joseph Boniecki, Paul Blinderman, trustee of the Paul Blinderman Revocable Trust, Elizabeth Blinderman, Ronald Berman, trustee of the Ronald Berman Revocable Trust, Vernon James Armour, trustee of the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 04/04/1988 and the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 08/14/2018, Edward Atkins, trustee of the Edward M. Atkins Trust, Atkins Investment Partnership, Michael Rosenbloom, Wing Point Investments LLC, Eytan Turjeman, Naamith Heiblum, Mordehai Heiblum. Related Document Number:83 ..(Kellogg, Jason) |
|
83 | 83
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs. Document filed by Terry Nelson-Johnson, David Decker, Sr., trustee for the Mary Louise Decker Family GST Trust, RJDC Management Company LLC, Stacy K Li, Deborah Loughman, Pearlene Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Jeffrey Goldberg, trustee of the Jeffrey M. Goldberg Trust u/a dtd 08/01/1995, James Papesch, David Malcolm Potts, Armando Pauker, Harmony Investments LLC, Max Luis Tejada, Eugene Goebel, John Muehlstein, trustee of the Peer Pedersen Trust, William Wayne Hancock III, trustee of the George B. Hancock Trust, John Vance Hancock, Sarita Mehta, Shai Wininger, Yehudith Heiblum, John Burke, Robert Brilliant, trustee of the Brilliant Family Trust, Edward Atkins, trustee of the Edward M. Atkins Trust, Ronald Berman, trustee of the Ronald Berman Revocable Trust, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Nancy Horween Trust, John H. Heuberger, trustee of the WBK 2012 Trust, James E. Salter, Thomas F. Reiser, Jr, Barbara Drumm, Elizabeth Blinderman, Jack Frank Aronov, Aaron Michael Silva, Scott Anthony Ronan, Barry P. Garrison, trustee of the Barry P. Garrison Trust, Bernard E. Francois, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Harriet C. Collis TUA Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Margaret Rockwell, Joseph Campolo, Jr, Peer Pedersen, Jr., trustee of the Declaration of Trust of Peer Pedersen, John D. Michael, Joseph Boniecki, Michael Harrigan, trustee for the Michael J. Harrigan Trust, Ridge Sampson, trustee of the Ridge Sampson Revocable Trust, Lisa D. Gagnum Boillot, Alison Patel, Seth Rosenberg, Etienne Boillot, Does 1 through 20, Amy Chuckrow, Sheffee Lulkin, David Decker, Jr., trustee of the 2017 Decker Family Irrevocable Gift Trust, Mark Ordower, trustee of the Mark Ordower Trust, Scott Kilrea, trustee of the Scott Kilrea Trust U/A DTD 04/14/1997, Ruthmarie Connor, trustee of the Rollin Polonitza Family Trust, Frances Armour Williamson, trustee of the Frances Armour Williamson TTEE Revocable Trust of Frances Armour Williamson, Daniel Michael, Nancy A.D. Hancock, Bret M. Walberg, Peter T. Lambrakis, Greg Isaacs, Ronald McLeod, trustee of the Ronald McLeod Revocable Trust, Narendrakumar Mehta, Rajesh Kannah Ramanujam, Shawkat Kero, Kimberly Seeds, Francis Campise, Chancellor Capital, Phillip Porpora, trustee of the Phillip Porpora Trust, Heather Thompson, Niloufer Kero, trustee of Niloufer Kero Revocable Family Trust, Beri Lynn Polonitza, trustee of the Beri Lynn Polonitza Revocable Trust, Joseph S. Chasen, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Patricia Booth Revocable Trust, Harminder Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Mary Helen Henske, Inna Koehler, Robert Mueckler, II, Dennis J. Fitzsimons, Mary Polonitza, trustee of the Jard Polonitza Separate Property Trust, John D. Marschall, trustee of the John D. Marschall Trust, Osman Uslu, Sherwood Guernsey, trustee of the Carol C. Guernsey Irrevocable Trust, Pareshkumar Desai, Naamith Heiblum, Jessa Ann Goebel, Four J Family LLC, Stephanie Marie Grein, 2012 DPDS Fund L.P., Ramesh Patel, Sameer Kero, trustee of the Flexedge Investment Management Defined Benefit Pension Plan & Trust, Sierra Springs Diversified Income Fund, LP, Eytan Turjeman, John L MacCarthy, trustee of the John Leland MacCarthy Revocable Trust, Anne Burke, Trinh-Mai N. Vo, Niloufer Kero, Vasundhara Tolia, S. Kero Limited Partnership, Ronald Kaplan, Dusty47 LLC, Peter J. McDonald, trustee of the Peter J. McDonald Trust DTD 04/22/2010, Nancy Mengel, Anthony V. Dub, Holly Nelson-Johnson, David Decker, Sr, Julie Lewis, Ordower Investments, Rachel Heiblum, Alia Driscoll, Dimitri Katamanin, Jonathan Stulgis, trustee of the Jonathan W. Stulgis Family Trust, Theodore Strange, James Sharman, Atkins Investment Partnership, Michael R. Kaskie, Margaux Marbury Harrold, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Carrie G. Cox TUW Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Etienne Boillot(trustees of the GST Trust ), Victoria Clewell, trustee of the Ronald J. Sloane Family Trust, Priya Ravi, Paul Blinderman, trustee of the Paul Blinderman Revocable Trust, John W. Buttrick, Liza Reynolds Limited Partnership, Jerome Yap Chua, Zohar Heiblum, Kilrea Family Investments, LLC, Smita Mehta, Karl John Henry Koehler, III(trustees of the Jay Koehler and Inna Koehler Living Trust), Charles Harrold, III, John Miller, Vernon James Armour, trustee of the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 04/04/1988 and the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 08/14/2018, Nancy Lynn Morton, trustee of the Harrold Family Dynasty Trust, Shefee Lulkin & Associates, Inc., N. Kero Investments, LTD., LLLP, Michael Driscoll, Andrew Baer, John P. Roy, Jr, Eleanor Robinson, Blair Ambach, Brent Horowitz, Stuart E. Lucas, LTR I LLC, Christopher John Burke, Joseph Campolo, Jr., trustee of the Joseph P Campolo Jr. Revocable Trust, Michael Harrigan, Philip Nadel, Karl John Henry Koehler, III, Jennifer Mvongo, trustee of the Jennifer M. Mvongo Revocable Trust, Kreiseder Family LLC, Stephen Jay Akana, Phillip Crump, Sameer Kero, Warrington Capital LLC, Sally Jo Morris, trustee of the Suzanne Kanis Revocable Trust, SAS ARDIS, Lillian Leong, Doris J. Wik, Barry Lance Polonitza, William McKenna, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Lisa Horween Kelly, Christopher John Burke, trustee of the Matrix Capital Advisors LLC Employee Savings Plan, Mari Christopherson, trustee of the Mari Louisa Christopherson Trust, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Laurence O. Booth Irrevocable Family Trust of 2012, Neal Driscoll, SSSB Partnership, Yiming Zhang, Reuven Heiblum, Stephanie Harrold, trustee of the Stephanie A. Harrold Revocable Trust, Steven Patrick Nedelka, Wing Point Investments LLC, Michael Rosenbloom, Dimitri Katamanin, trustee of the Four Season's Trust, Sandra Sue Koehler, Michael Witlin, Orla Cunningham LLC, Mordehai Heiblum, Palamine Holdings LLC, Charles Cotton Harrold IV, trustee of the C. Cotton Harrold IV Investment Trust, Chanda Mehta Kero, Loeb Holding Corporation, Jonathan Stulgis, Gerald Guy Stokes, Jr, Bennet Woodward. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Kellogg, Jason) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 11/12 8:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jason Kellogg. RE-FILE Document No. 82 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). The Order needs to be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. File the Order separately using Proposed Orders. (km) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Tue 11/12 1:27 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 84 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
Monday, November 11, 2024 | ||
82 | 82
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Terry Nelson-Johnson, David Decker, Sr., trustee for the Mary Louise Decker Family GST Trust, RJDC Management Company LLC, Stacy K Li, Pearlene Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Jeffrey Goldberg, trustee of the Jeffrey M. Goldberg Trust u/a dtd 08/01/1995, James Papesch, David Malcolm Potts, Armando Pauker, Harmony Investments LLC, Max Luis Tejada, Eugene Goebel, John Muehlstein, trustee of the Peer Pedersen Trust, William Wayne Hancock III, trustee of the George B. Hancock Trust, John Vance Hancock, Sarita Mehta, Shai Wininger, John Burke, Robert Brilliant, trustee of the Brilliant Family Trust, Edward Atkins, trustee of the Edward M. Atkins Trust, Ronald Berman, trustee of the Ronald Berman Revocable Trust, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Nancy Horween Trust, John H. Heuberger, trustee of the WBK 2012 Trust, James E. Salter, Thomas F. Reiser, Jr, Barbara Drumm, Elizabeth Blinderman, Jack Frank Aronov, Aaron Michael Silva, Scott Anthony Ronan, Barry P. Garrison, trustee of the Barry P. Garrison Trust, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Harriet C. Collis TUA Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Margaret Rockwell, Joseph Campolo, Jr, Peer Pedersen, Jr., trustee of the Declaration of Trust of Peer Pedersen, John D. Michael, Joseph Boniecki, Michael Harrigan, trustee for the Michael J. Harrigan Trust, Ridge Sampson, trustee of the Ridge Sampson Revocable Trust, Lisa D. Gagnum Boillot, Alison Patel, Etienne Boillot, Amy Chuckrow, Sheffee Lulkin, David Decker, Jr., trustee of the 2017 Decker Family Irrevocable Gift Trust, Mark Ordower, trustee of the Mark Ordower Trust, Scott Kilrea, trustee of the Scott Kilrea Trust U/A DTD 04/14/1997, Ruthmarie Connor, trustee of the Rollin Polonitza Family Trust, Frances Armour Williamson, trustee of the Frances Armour Williamson TTEE Revocable Trust of Frances Armour Williamson, Daniel Michael, Nancy A.D. Hancock, Peter T. Lambrakis, Bret M. Walberg, Ronald McLeod, trustee of the Ronald McLeod Revocable Trust, Narendrakumar Mehta, Rajesh Kannah Ramanujam, Shawkat Kero, Kimberly Seeds, Francis Campise, Chancellor Capital, Phillip Porpora, trustee of the Phillip Porpora Trust, Heather Thompson, Niloufer Kero, trustee of Niloufer Kero Revocable Family Trust, Beri Lynn Polonitza, trustee of the Beri Lynn Polonitza Revocable Trust, Joseph S. Chasen, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Patricia Booth Revocable Trust, Harminder Brar, trustee of the Brar Family Trust, Mary Helen Henske, Inna Koehler, Robert Mueckler, II, Dennis J. Fitzsimons, Mary Polonitza, trustee of the Jard Polonitza Separate Property Trust, John D. Marschall, trustee of the John D. Marschall Trust, Osman Uslu, Sherwood Guernsey, trustee of the Carol C. Guernsey Irrevocable Trust, Pareshkumar Desai, Jessa Ann Goebel, Four J Family LLC, Stephanie Marie Grein, 2012 DPDS Fund L.P., Ramesh Patel, Sameer Kero, trustee of the Flexedge Investment Management Defined Benefit Pension Plan & Trust, Eytan Turjeman, John L MacCarthy, trustee of the John Leland MacCarthy Revocable Trust, Anne Burke, Trinh-Mai N. Vo, Niloufer Kero, Vasundhara Tolia, S. Kero Limited Partnership, Ronald Kaplan, Dusty47 LLC, Peter J. McDonald, trustee of the Peter J. McDonald Trust DTD 04/22/2010, Nancy Mengel, Anthony V. Dub, Holly Nelson-Johnson, David Decker, Sr, Julie Lewis, Ordower Investments, Alia Driscoll, Dimitri Katamanin, Jonathan Stulgis, trustee of the Jonathan W. Stulgis Family Trust, Theodore Strange, James Sharman, Atkins Investment Partnership, Michael R. Kaskie, Margaux Marbury Harrold, U.S. Bank N.A. and Soyla V. Rausch, trustees for the Carrie G. Cox TUW Tr. B FBO Mary Hancock, Etienne Boillot(trustees of the GST Trust ), Victoria Clewell, trustee of the Ronald J. Sloane Family Trust, Priya Ravi, Paul Blinderman, trustee of the Paul Blinderman Revocable Trust, John W. Buttrick, Liza Reynolds Limited Partnership, Jerome Yap Chua, Kilrea Family Investments, LLC, Smita Mehta, Karl John Henry Koehler, III(trustees of the Jay Koehler and Inna Koehler Living Trust), Charles Harrold, III, John Miller, Vernon James Armour, trustee of the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 04/04/1988 and the Vernon James Armour Trust dated 08/14/2018, Nancy Lynn Morton, trustee of the Harrold Family Dynasty Trust, Shefee Lulkin & Associates, Inc., N. Kero Investments, LTD., LLLP, Michael Driscoll, John P. Roy, Jr, Eleanor Robinson, Blair Ambach, Brent Horowitz, Stuart E. Lucas, LTR I LLC, Christopher John Burke, Joseph Campolo, Jr., trustee of the Joseph P Campolo Jr. Revocable Trust, Michael Harrigan, Philip Nadel, Jennifer Mvongo, trustee of the Jennifer M. Mvongo Revocable Trust, Karl John Henry Koehler, III, Stephen Jay Akana, Kreiseder Family LLC, Phillip Crump, Sameer Kero, Warrington Capital LLC, Sally Jo Morris, trustee of the Suzanne Kanis Revocable Trust, Lillian Leong, SAS ARDIS, Doris J. Wik, Barry Lance Polonitza, William McKenna, JP Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, trustee of the Trust Under the Will of Marion E. Horween FBO Lisa Horween Kelly, Christopher John Burke, trustee of the Matrix Capital Advisors LLC Employee Savings Plan, Mari Christopherson, trustee of the Mari Louisa Christopherson Trust, Patricia Booth, trustee of the Laurence O. Booth Irrevocable Family Trust of 2012, Neal Driscoll, SSSB Partnership, Yiming Zhang, Steven Patrick Nedelka, Stephanie Harrold, trustee of the Stephanie A. Harrold Revocable Trust, Dimitri Katamanin, trustee of the Four Season's Trust, Michael Witlin, Orla Cunningham LLC, Sandra Sue Koehler, Palamine Holdings LLC, Charles Cotton Harrold IV, trustee of the C. Cotton Harrold IV Investment Trust, Chanda Mehta Kero, Loeb Holding Corporation, Jonathan Stulgis, Gerald Guy Stokes, Jr, Bennet Woodward. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kellogg, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |