Original Case: 5:20-cv-00185

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.pr-01104
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 04, 2022 3:25 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
ACADEMY FINANCIAL ASSETS, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Nis Leerberg
FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP
contact info
Brian A. Kilpatrick
CONDON TOBIN SLADEK THORNTON, PLLC
contact info
Aaron Zachary Tobin
CONDON TOBIN SLADEK THORNTON, PLLC
contact info
Matthew William Krueger-Andes
FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
COLORADO BANKERS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Wes John Camden
WILLIAMS MULLEN
contact info
Mary Woodell Scruggs
WILLIAMS MULLEN
contact info
Camden Robert Webb
WILLIAMS MULLEN
contact info
Lauren E. Fussell
WILLIAMS MULLEN
contact info
Caitlin McLaughlin Poe
WILLIAMS MULLEN
contact info

GPO Feb 15 2023
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00185-D. [1001316353] [22-1104]

Docket last updated: 02/04/2022 3:22 AM EST
Thursday, February 03, 2022
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00185-D. Case manager: REdwards. [1001103530] 22-1104 RE [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:41 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00185-D. Mailed to: Lauren E. Fussell, Brian A. Kilpatrick, and Aaron Zachary Tobin. [1001103537] 22-1104 RE [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:45 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Lauren E. Fussell, Brian A. Kilpatrick, and Aaron Zachary Tobin. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001103557] Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/15/2022. Response Brief due 04/14/2022 22-1104 RE [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:54 AM]
Related: [-]