FLEMMING v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-01369 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00197 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 03, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN KEITH FLEMMING
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/10 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of DUSTIN KEITH FLEMMING (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/10 2:59 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by DUSTIN KEITH FLEMMING. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/04 3:04 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 2/24/2022 .) (djb) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Fri 02/04 2:53 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/04 1:14 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-139) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
5 | 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-197 JRT/TNL. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9285866) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/4/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |