Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:22-cv-00351
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 03, 2022 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Brian Michael Hansen
contact info
William S Fulton, Jr
Culhane Law Firm
contact info
Mark G Schroeder
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Community Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By
Brian Michael Hansen
contact info
William S Fulton, Jr
Culhane Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathryn Granados
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Price Law Group, Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 07/06/2022
Represented By
Jeremy Thompson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 07/13/2022
Represented By
Trevor Parkes
Jones Day - Minneapolis
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 07/06/2022


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/06 2:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/6/2023.(CLG)
Related: [-]
59 59 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 03/06 10:46 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re58 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
58 58 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/06 10:45 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Community Loan Servicing, LLC by Kathryn Granados. Jointly Signed by Bank of America, N.A. and Community Loan Servicing, LLC. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]