California Central District Court
Case #: 2:22-mj-00456
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 04, 2022 11:19 PM PST
Defendant
Jose Munoz (2)
Defendant
Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Carel Ale
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julia Hu
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2022 12:01 AM PST
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
ARREST OF DEFENDANT FERNANDO ENRIQUE ROMAN-GARCIA. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia (cio)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jose Munoz (cio)
Related: [-]
6 6 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia; defendants Year of Birth: 1998; date of arrest: 2/2/2022 (cio)
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Contested detention hearing held. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Carel Ale for Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant temporarily detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/17/2022 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge., Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 2/24/2022 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge., Detention Hearing set for 2/9/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick.), COMPLAINT ORDERED SEALED., (SPANISH) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia Court Smart: CS 02/03/2022. (cio)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 02/17/2022 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 02/24/2022 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (cio)
Related: [-]
9 9 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. (cio)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. (cio)
Related: [-]
11 11 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (cio)
Related: [-]
12 12 Proceedings: (IN CHAMBERS) MANDATORY RULE 5(f) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia (cio)
Related: [-]
13 13 ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. Ordered that the defendant be Housed or designated to MDCLA. Housed separately from defendant Jose Munoz. Defendant to be housed separately forthwith.(cio)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Fernando Enrique Roman-Garcia. Pending hearing, the defendant shall be held in custody by the U. S. Marshal and produced for the hearing. Detention Hearing set for 2/9/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (cio)
Related: [-]