Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50621

Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 5:22-ap-05001
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2022
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States of America
Connecticut Financial Center 157 Church Street
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
United States of America
contact info
Defendant
State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
450 Columbus Blvd. Suite 1
Hartford, CT 06130
Represented By
State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
contact info
Defendant
Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc.
120 Honey Hill Road
Weston, CT 06897
Represented By
Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Midland Funding, LLC
Attn: Pres., Ofc Mgr., or Acct. Rep. 100 Pearl St., 17th Floor, MC-CSC1
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Midland Funding, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Leeds
14 Jana Drive
Weston, CT 06883
Represented By
Scott M. Charmoy
Charmoy & Charmoy
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura W. Leeds
14 Jana Drive
Weston, CT 06883
Represented By
Scott M. Charmoy
Charmoy & Charmoy
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
43 43 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/13 12:44 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:22-ap-5001 Closed. . (gr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
41 41 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment - AP Wed 08/17 3:14 PM
Default Judgment Against Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. And Midland Funding, LLC Related [+] . (sds)
Related: [-] 32
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
40 40 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 08/16 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/16/2022 10:23:07 AM ]. File Size [ 2898 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:03 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
39 39 court Hearing Held Tue 08/16 12:06 PM
Hearing Held. Related [+] 32 Request for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds, Order Granting to enter for the reasons stated on the record). (pe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing Thu 07/21 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Notice of Hearing
Monday, July 18, 2022
37 37 2 pgs court Notice of Hearing Mon 07/18 3:29 PM
Notice of Hearing Issued Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 8/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. (pe)
Related: [-] 32 Request for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds
Thursday, June 23, 2022
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulated Order
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order of Stipulated Judgment
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/24 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulated Order
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
32 32 motion Default Judgment Wed 06/22 1:49 PM
Request for Default Judgment by the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055 (b)(2) against Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs . Response(s) due by 07/13/2022. (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
31 31 5 pgs order Order Tue 06/21 2:10 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal as to Defendant United States of America, Internal Revenue Service Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds, 24 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds.) (pe)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Stipulated Order Tue 06/21 2:07 PM
Stipulated Order Approving Stipulation of Settlement submitted by Plaintiffs Richard and Laura Leeds and Defendant United States of America, Internal Revenue Service . (pe)
Related: [-]
29 29 3 pgs order Order of Stipulated Judgment Tue 06/21 2:02 PM
Stipulated Judgment on Complaint to Avoid Liens Pursuant to §506(a) and (d) In Favor of Plaintiffs Against Defendant State of Connecticut, Department of Revenue Services By Judge Julie A. Manning Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds.) (pe)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Stipulated Order Tue 06/21 1:59 PM
Stipulated Order on Complaint to Avoid Liens Pursuant to §506(a) and (d) submitted by Plaintiffs Richard and Laura Leeds and Defendant State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services . (pe)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 18, 2022
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/19 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/18/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, June 16, 2022
26 26 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 06/16 2:06 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant, Midland Funding, LLC For Failure to Plead or Otherwise Defend pursuant to FRBP 7055(a). Related [+] 23 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds). (zaz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 06/15 1:13 PM
Stipulation with Connecticut Department of Revenue Services . Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds Plaintiffs Related [+] (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds
24 24 5 pgs misc Stipulation Wed 06/15 1:12 PM
Stipulation with Internal Revenue Service . Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds Plaintiffs Related [+] (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds
23 23 3 pgs motion Request for Entry of Default Wed 06/15 1:06 PM
Request for Entry of Default against Midland Funding, LLC Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
22 22 court Request for Entry of Default Defective Wed 06/01 1:41 PM
Request for Entry of Default Defective: Request not served on defendant Midland Funding LLC at the address of record and where summons was served. No action to be taken as this Request is defective. Related [+] 21 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds). (gr) Modified on 6/1/2022 (gr)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Request for Entry of Default Wed 06/01 11:36 AM
Request for Entry of Default against Midland Funding, LLC Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 05/31 3:09 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certification of Service Filed by Maria A. Santos on behalf of State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services Defendant, . (Santos, Maria)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Request for Entry of Default Defective Tue 05/31 2:00 PM
Request for Entry of Default Defective: The certificate of service does not indicate service was made on Defendant Midland Funding, LLC at the address of record in accordance with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004. No action to be taken as this Request is defective. Related [+] 18 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds). (gr)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Request for Entry of Default Tue 05/31 11:27 AM
Request for Entry of Default against Midland Funding, LLC Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
17 17 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 04/26 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/26/2022 1:58:15 PM ]. File Size [ 3126 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:41 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Hearing Held Tue 04/26 2:59 PM
Hearing Held. Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds, Pretrial Conference held, no further Pretrial Conferences will be scheduled at this time for the reasons stated on the record). (pe)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 23, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/24 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, April 21, 2022
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/21 2:58 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. For Failure to Plead or Otherwise Defend pursuant to FRBP 7055(a). Related [+] 13 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds). (gr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Tue 04/19 4:19 PM
Request for Entry of Default against Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 09, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/10 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Generate BNC Notice/Form
Thursday, April 07, 2022
11 11 court Virtual Order Served Thu 04/07 2:35 PM
Service made on Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. c/o Rose D. Heggland, Agent for Service, 120 Honey Hill Road, Weston, CT 06897; Midland Funding, LLC c/o Corporation Service Co., Agent, Attn; Pres., Ofc Mgr., or Acct. Rep., 100 Pearl St., 17th Floor, MC-CSC1, Hartford, CT 06103; State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services, 450 Columbus Blvd., Suite 1, Hartford, CT 06130 via first class mail Related [+] 9 Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference). (rms)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Generate BNC Notice/Form Thu 04/07 2:20 PM
ECF No. 9 generated for BNC Noticing. (rms)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Continue Hearing Thu 04/07 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. The Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference, ECF No.8 , is GRANTED . The Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 4, 2022 is continued to April 26, 2022 at 2:00 PM at the United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. Related [+] . On or before April 7, 2022 the Clerk's Office shall serve this Order on Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC, State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services the Pro Se filers/litigants, via first class mail to the address listed on the Pro Se filers/litigants' pleading filed in the adversary. Signed by Judge Julie A. Manning on April 7, 2022. (rms)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
8 8 motion Continue/Reschedule Hearing Wed 04/06 12:31 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs Related [+] Response(s) due by 04/27/2022. (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
7 7 motion Continue/Reschedule Hearing Tue 04/05 11:46 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Laura W. Leeds, Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiffs Related [+] Response(s) due by 04/26/2022. (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, March 14, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/14 3:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant United States of America Related [+] (Nash, Lauren)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 03/14 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lauren M. Nash on behalf of United States of America Defendant, . (Nash, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/23 11:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on Defendant(s) Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. 2/9/2022; Midland Funding, LLC 2/9/2022; State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services 2/14/2022; United States of America 2/15/2022 . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/10 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, February 07, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Mon 02/07 11:52 AM
Summons Issued on Defendant(s) Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc. Date Issued 2/7/2022, Answer Due 3/9/2022; Midland Funding, LLC Date Issued 2/7/2022, Answer Due 3/9/2022; State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services Date Issued 2/7/2022, Answer Due 3/9/2022; United States of America Date Issued 2/7/2022, Answer Due 3/9/2022 Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Leeds, Plaintiff Laura W. Leeds). Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 02:00 PM. (Esposito, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/07 10:56 AM
Adversary case 22-05001 Complaint (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Richard A. Leeds, Laura W. Leeds against United States of America, State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services, Connecticut Floor Supply, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. Receipt #NotDue Fee Amount $350. Fee Not Due. (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Adversary Cover Sheet