Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-32243

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:22-ap-03019
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2022
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Peter Shaper
Represented By
Caitlin A Halpern
Gibbs Bruns LLP
contact info
Eric M. English
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Ross MacDonald
Gibbs & Bruns, LLP
contact info
Ayesha Najam
Gibbs & Bruns
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Youngman
Represented By
Judd Linden
Zaiger LLC
contact info
Bryce Callahan
Yetter Coleman LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Zaiger
Zaiger LLC
contact info
Susanna Allen
Yetter Coleman LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 15 2022
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 9/15/2022 (Related document(s):20 Motion for Remand) (TylerLaws)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, July 25, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/25 4:02 PM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3019 Closed. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
misc Delivery Confirmation Wed 09/21 11:54 AM
***Delivery Confirmation; delivery date(s) 9/19/2022 Related [+] (dhan)
Related: [-] 33 Opinion,34 Generic Order
Saturday, September 17, 2022
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Generic Order
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Opinion
Thursday, September 15, 2022
34 34 order Generic Order Thu 09/15 5:04 PM
Order in 4:22-ap-3019, Signed on 9/15/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
33 33 14 pgs order Opinion Thu 09/15 5:02 PM
Memorandum Opinion , Signed on 9/15/2022 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand
Monday, June 13, 2022
32 32 audio MP3 Mon 06/13 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/13/2022 8:57:25 AM ]. File Size [ 41319 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:05 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
31 31 court Courtroom Minutes Mon 06/13 10:28 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 am - 10:23 am. Appearances: Bryce Callahan for the Plaintiff. Eric English, Caitlin Halpern and Ross MacDonald for the Defendant. The Court takes20 under advisement as stated on the record. Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference,6 Motion to Dismiss Party,20 Motion for Remand
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
30 30 order Seal Tue 05/24 12:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Seal Related [+] Signed on 5/24/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
29 29 order Seal Wed 05/11 9:56 AM
Order Granting Motion to Seal Related [+] Signed on 5/11/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, May 02, 2022
28 28 misc Brief Mon 05/02 5:11 PM
Brief (Filed By Peter Shaper ) Related [+] (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Party
27 27 misc Sealed Document Mon 05/02 4:52 PM
Sealed Document Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Filed By Peter Shaper ). (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Mon 05/02 4:46 PM
Motion to Seal Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
court Hearing Cont Wed 04/27 12:29 PM
Hearing Reset, by request (unopposed) Related [+] Contacted by Bryce Callahan and Ross MacDonald. Parties notified. Hearing rescheduled for 6/13/2022 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference,6 Motion to Dismiss Party,20 Motion for Remand
Monday, April 18, 2022
25 25 misc Sealed Document Mon 04/18 8:42 PM
Sealed Document Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Opposition to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 6) (Filed By Catherine Youngman ). (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Mon 04/18 8:40 PM
Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Opposition to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff Catherine Youngman (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 answer Response Mon 04/18 8:37 PM
Response and Brief in Opposition to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion Related [+]. Filed by Catherine Youngman (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-] dacted6 Motion to Dismiss Party
Thursday, April 07, 2022
22 22 answer Reply Thu 04/07 4:06 PM
Reply in Support of Motion to Remand Related [+]. Filed by Catherine Youngman (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand
Thursday, March 31, 2022
court Hearing Set Thu 03/31 9:30 AM
For case management purposes only. Hearing Set On Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand
Monday, March 28, 2022
21 21 misc Response Mon 03/28 5:40 PM
Response (Filed By Peter Shaper ) Related [+] (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Remand
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
20 20 motion Remand Wed 03/09 6:12 PM
Motion for Remand. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Plaintiff Catherine Youngman (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
19 19 order Seal Wed 03/09 7:22 AM
Order Authorizing Defendant to File Unredacted Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Signed on 3/8/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 04, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/04 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/04/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
17 17 order Seal Wed 03/02 9:52 AM
Order Authorizing Defendant to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
16 16 order Setting Hearing Tue 03/01 6:33 PM
Scheduling Order, Signed on 3/1/2022 Related [+] Hearings scheduled for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference,6 Motion to Dismiss Party,14 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing,15 Proposed Order
15 15 misc Proposed Order Tue 03/01 3:09 PM
Proposed Order RE: Scheduling Order (Filed By Peter Shaper ) Related [+] (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
14 14 motion Continue Hearing Tue 03/01 3:06 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+]. Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference,6 Motion to Dismiss Party,8 Sealed Motion
Monday, February 21, 2022
13 13 misc Statement Mon 02/21 12:40 PM
Statement Regarding Consent (Filed By Catherine Youngman ). (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/21 12:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susanna Allen Filed by on behalf of Catherine Youngman (Allen, Susanna)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/21 12:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bryce Callahan Filed by on behalf of Catherine Youngman (Callahan, Bryce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
10 10 notice Notice Tue 02/15 1:29 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss . Related [+] Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Party
court Hearing Cont Tue 02/15 12:26 PM
Hearing Reset Related [+] Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing rescheduled for 3/21/2022 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Party
Monday, February 14, 2022
9 9 misc Request for Hearing Mon 02/14 6:24 PM
Request for Hearing (Filed By Peter Shaper ) Related [+] (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Party
8 8 motion Sealed Motion Mon 02/14 6:13 PM
Sealed Motion Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Mon 02/14 6:10 PM
Motion to Seal Unredacted Motion to Dismiss Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Dismiss Party Mon 02/14 6:05 PM
Motion to Dismiss Party . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Peter Shaper Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
Monday, February 07, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Mon 02/07 12:35 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Sealed Document Mon 02/07 10:09 AM
Sealed Document (Filed By Peter Shaper ). (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Mon 02/07 10:07 AM
Motion to Seal the Unredacted Complaint Filed by Peter Shaper (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal [system event] Mon 02/07 9:42 AM
Adversary case 22-03019 Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Notice of Removal Catherine Youngman. Fee Amount $350 (Najam, Ayesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9