California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:22-cv-00783
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2022 1:28 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Anitoa Systems, LLC
Represented By
Alfredo William Amoedo
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Moore, III
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
LuminUltra Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By
Ivan L Tjoe
Rimon Law
contact info
Defendant
Anitoa Systems, LLC
Represented By
Alfredo William Amoedo
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Moore, III
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LuminUltra Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By
Ivan L Tjoe
Rimon Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
84 84 minutes Judgment Debtor Exam Mon 04/07 8:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: Judgment Debtor Exam held on 4/4/2025. Zhimin Ding appeared and was sworn. The parties were excused to conduct the examination. Zoom Recording Time: 9:03 - 9:05. Plaintiff Attorney: Ivan Tjoe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2025)
Related: [-]