Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01407
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2022 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BRITNEY TOWNSEND
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 4:44 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/07 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota by BRITNEY TOWNSEND (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/07 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6666834.), filed by BRITNEY TOWNSEND. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet