Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:22-cv-80203
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2022
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 07, 2022 5:32 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Kaufman Lynn Construction, Inc.
Represented By
Leena Phaguda
Saxe Doernberger , Vita, P.C.
contact info
Rachel S. Pearson
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Stacy M. Manobianca
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Gregory David Podolak
Saxe Doernberger And Vita P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Fay E. Ryan
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig, LLP
contact info
Yonit Rosengarten
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Defendant
United Glass Systems Corp.
Represented By
Jordan Louis Rappaport
contact info
Defendant
Kaufman Lynn Construction, Inc.
Represented By
Leena Phaguda
Saxe Doernberger , Vita, P.C.
contact info
Rachel S. Pearson
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Stacy M. Manobianca
Saxe Doernberger & Vita, P.C.
contact info
Gregory David Podolak
Saxe Doernberger And Vita P.C.
contact info
Mediator
John S. Freud
PO Box 1986
Miami, FL 33233
Plaintiff
Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Fay E. Ryan
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig, LLP
contact info
Yonit Rosengarten
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 06 2022
OMNIBUS ORDER ON OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES: granting 76 Defendant Kaufman Lynn Construction Inc.'s Motion to Compel. Ms. Dorne-Smith shall sit for a second deposition, on or before September 23, 2022. In this regard, the Court finds that extending the September 15, 2022 discovery deadline until September 23, 2022 for the limited purpose of conducting Ms. Dorne-Smiths second deposition is necessary and appropriate. Discovery extended to 9/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (kza)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
232 232 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/28 3:06 PM
ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re231 Status Report filed by Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. Parties' request for a 30-day deadline, until May 19, 2025 is granted. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (cwc)
Related: [-]