Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Hector L Ramos-Vega
Case #: 3:22-cv-01069
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2022
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 07, 2022 5:55 AM AST
Defendant
A, B and C Corporations
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Flores-Roe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Roe
Represented By
Anselmo Irizarry-Irizarry
Anselmo Irizarry Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Luis G. Flores Rivera
Represented By
Melissa Figueroa-Del Valle
contact info
Igor Dominguez-Perez
Igor J. Dominguez Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc.
or alternatively, John Doe Corporation Ave. Pedro Albizu Campos Urb. La Hacienda
Guayama, PR 00785
Represented By
Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Andreu & Sagardia Law Office
contact info
Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez
Jpl Law Firm LLC
contact info
Juan Antonio Pedrero-Lozada
Jpl Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Miguel E. Sagardia-De-Jesus
Andreu & Sagardia Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Juan D. Ortiz Rivera
Represented By
Anselmo Irizarry-Irizarry
Anselmo Irizarry Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Betty Roe
Defendant
Mary Roe
Represented By
Anselmo Irizarry-Irizarry
Anselmo Irizarry Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Richard Roe
Defendant
Jane Roe
Defendant
Unknown Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Maria Berrios Gonzalez
Represented By
David Efron
David Efron Law Offices
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2023
OPINION AND ORDER denying 40 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony of Plaintiff's expert witness Mr. Robert J. Lerer filed by Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 11/08/2023.(Ramos-Vega, Hector)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
139 139 order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Wed 04/23 9:54 AM
ORDER granting137 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Clerk's Office Financial Manager is to take notice and disburse the funds immediately after the new installment becomes available for disbursement. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 04/23/2025. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)
Related: [-]
138 138 order Order on Motion to Restrict Wed 04/23 9:49 AM
ORDER granting136 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 04/23/2025. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
137 137 motion Disbursement of Funds Mon 04/21 5:40 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by David Efron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Efron, David)
Related: [-]
136 136 motion Restrict Mon 04/21 5:36 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document filed by David Efron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Efron, David)
Related: [-]
135 135 order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Mon 04/21 12:49 PM
ORDER noted and granted134 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Finance Department of the Clerk's Office shall take notice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 04/21/2025. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)
Related: [-]
134 134 motion Deposit Funds Mon 04/21 12:44 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Maria Berrios Gonzalez. Responses due by 5/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
133 133 order Order on Motion to Restrict Mon 04/21 12:39 PM
ORDER granting132 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 04/21/2025. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)
Related: [-]
132 132 motion Restrict Mon 04/21 9:36 AM
MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc.. Responses due by 5/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
Related: [-]
misc Deposit of Funds Mon 04/21 3:23 PM
DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ SEALED, receipt number 117806, re d.e.134 . To be deposited on the next working day in an interest-bearing account in compliance with L.Cv.R. 67. **FUNDS WILL BE AVAILABLE FOR DISBURSEMENT AFTER 7 WORKING DAYS** (rim)
Related: [-]