Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-01542
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2022 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BRYAN PRIMEAUX
Represented By
KATHARINE GALE KROTTINGER
Monsour Law Firm - Longview Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/06 2:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Wed 02/09 2:36 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTE TO FILER For future reference the Cause of Action is 28:1332pl (Diversity - Product Liability) (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/09 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6674826.), filed by BRYAN PRIMEAUX. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet